EP1486259 - Adjustable adapter for gravity-feed paint sprayer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gosis, Anatoly 552 S. Burno Drive Palatine Illinois 60067 / US | 02 /
Bauer, Mark D. 1911 Burr Oak Drive Mount Prospect Illinois 60056 / US | 03 /
Burns, Marvin D. 3491 Walbridge Road Millbury Ohio 43447 / US | 04 /
Charpie, Mark E. 3933 Meadowview Street Lambertville Michigan 48144 / US | 05 /
Kobetsky, Robert G. 6340 N. Leroy Chicago Illinois 60646 / US | 06 /
Kosmyna, Michael J. 2442 Shoreland Avenue Toledo Ohio 43611 / US | 07 /
Toczycki, Jan 6531 N. Chicora Avenue Chicago Illinois 60646 / US | 08 /
Velan, Michael G. 614 South Louis Street Mount Prospect Illinois 60056 / US | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Heinze, Ekkehard, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Heinze, Ekkehard, Dr., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Gbr, Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04009886.5 | 26.04.2004 | [2004/51] | Priority number, date | US20030458548 | 10.06.2003 Original published format: US 458548 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1486259 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1486259 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/24, F16L27/00 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
B05B7/2405 (EP,US);
B05B7/30 (KR);
B05B7/2413 (EP,US);
B05B7/2478 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2006/42] |
Former [2004/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einstellbarer Adapter für eine durch Schwerkraft gespeiste Spritzpistole | [2004/51] | English: | Adjustable adapter for gravity-feed paint sprayer | [2004/51] | French: | Adaptateur réglable pour pulvérisateur alimenté par gravité | [2004/51] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/21] | 20.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1566254 (SUBMARINE & SAFETY ENG LTD) [A] 2,6 * page 1, lines 51-56 * * page 1, lines 65,66; figure . *; | [X]GB2182994 (CLABER SPA) [X] 1-6 * page 1, line 108 - page 2, line 52; figures 1-5 *; | [X]WO9205884 (K F IND AS [DK]) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 11; figure - *; | [X]US5275444 (WYTHOFF JOHAN G [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 49; figures 1-5 *; | [X]FR2718062 (GENEVE ROLAND [FR]) [X] 1-6 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 26; figures 2-8 *; | [A]DE20010777U (CHANG AN MEI [TW]) [A] 2,6 * page 2, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [A]DE10022683 (LIEPE KAI [DE]) [A] 2,6* column 3, lines 16-19; figure . * | by applicant | US5803360 | US6053429 | US6536684 |