EP1473061 - Method for admixture (dosing) of liquid additives in fire extinguishing installations with water-based fire extinguishing agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rassek, Bernd-Dietrich Waldfrieden 54 42369 Wuppertal / DE | [2004/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vonhof, Alexander Am Lohsiepen 154 42369 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
Rassek, Stefan Erbschlö 24 42369 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
Dietrich, Matthias Hardbach 10 42477 Radevormwald / DE | 04 /
Waetzoldt, Andreas Paradestrasse 32 42107 Wuppertal / DE | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Gerbaulet, Hannes RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Gerbaulet, Hannes, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Richter, Werdermann Gerbaulet & Hofmann Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04009946.7 | 27.04.2004 | [2004/45] | Priority number, date | DE2003119726 | 30.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10319726 | [2004/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1473061 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1473061 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A62C5/02 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
A62C5/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Zumischung (Dosierung) von flüssigen Löschmittelzusätzen in Feuerlöschanlagen mit wässrigen Löschmitteln | [2004/45] | English: | Method for admixture (dosing) of liquid additives in fire extinguishing installations with water-based fire extinguishing agents | [2004/45] | French: | Procédé d'addition (dosage) d'additifs liquides dans des installations de lutte contre l'incendie avec agents d'extinction à base d'eau | [2004/45] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 18.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.07.2009 | CZ | 08.07.2009 | DK | 08.07.2009 | EE | 08.07.2009 | FI | 08.07.2009 | IE | 08.07.2009 | IT | 08.07.2009 | NL | 08.07.2009 | PL | 08.07.2009 | RO | 08.07.2009 | SE | 08.07.2009 | SI | 08.07.2009 | SK | 08.07.2009 | TR | 08.07.2009 | BG | 08.10.2009 | GR | 09.10.2009 | ES | 19.10.2009 | PT | 09.11.2009 | HU | 09.01.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 08.07.2009 | |
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IE | 08.07.2009 | ||
IT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
HU | 09.01.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 08.07.2009 | |
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IE | 08.07.2009 | ||
IT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 08.07.2009 | |
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IE | 08.07.2009 | ||
IT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CZ | 08.07.2009 | |
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IE | 08.07.2009 | ||
IT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CZ | 08.07.2009 | |
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IE | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 08.07.2009 | |
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IE | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CZ | 08.07.2009 | |
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IE | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 08.07.2009 | |
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IE | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | FI | 08.07.2009 | |
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 08.07.2009 | |
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
PL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 08.07.2009 | |
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | SI | 08.07.2009 | |
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | SI | 08.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US346571 (ASHCROFT EDWARD H) [Y] 1-4,6-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US1403596 (ERWIN JAMES B, et al) [Y] 1-4,6-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0638333 (VOGT AG FEUERWEHRGERAETE UND F [CH]) [Y] 1-4,6-10 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1147788 (VIGH ANDREAS DIPL ING [CH]) [AD] 1-10* the whole document * |