EP1473801 - Cable tapping clamp for a power-supply cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESV GmbH Branigleite 23 96472 Rödental / DE | [2004/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gänslein, Hans-Günther Langer Rain 65 96472 Rödental / DE | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 440151 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/45] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner GbR Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04010086.9 | 28.04.2004 | [2004/45] | Priority number, date | DE20031019542 | 30.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10319542 | [2004/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1473801 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1473801 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/03, H02G15/10 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
H01R9/031 (EP,US);
H02G15/113 (EP);
H01R4/2408 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2005/29] |
Former [2004/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kabelabzweigklemme für Energieversorgungskabel | [2004/45] | English: | Cable tapping clamp for a power-supply cable | [2004/45] | French: | Borne de dérivation pour un câble d'alimentation électrique | [2004/45] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 04.05.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.07.2006 | GB | 26.07.2006 | ES | 06.11.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/29] | GB | 26.07.2006 | |
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | ES | 06.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1765242 (PFISTERER ELEKTROTECH KARL) [Y] 1,3,5,9 * column 1, lines 36-62 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 23 * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]EP0666615 (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME ENERGIE [DE]) [Y] 1,3,5,9 * abstract * * column 5, line 9 - column 6, line 9 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE19727567 (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME ENERGIE [DE]) [A] 1,3,5-9 * abstract * * column 5, lines 13-43 ** figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0923160 (JORDAN PAUL ELTECH [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 4 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 15 * * column 4, lines 21-37 * * figures 1,2 * |