EP1475141 - Catalyst for purifying diesel engine exhaust gas and method for production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Revocation of patent | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICT Co., Ltd. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0043 / JP | For all designated states International Catalyst Technology, Inc. 2347 Commercial Drive Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | [2012/03] |
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states ICT Co., Ltd. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | ||
For all designated states International Catalyst Technology, Inc. 2347 Commercial Drive Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horiuchi, Makoto 2-17-2, Aoyama-kita Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-2221 / JP | 02 /
Hori, Masao 1-59-506, Kameyama Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-0973 / JP | 03 /
Yoshikawa, Tatsuya B612, 1736-3, Imajuku Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-0052 / JP | 04 /
Fukumoto, Atsushi 1947-6-210, Nishioka Uozumi-cho Akashi-shi Hyogo 674-0084 / JP | 05 /
Nakane, Takuji 931-11-F-201, Hamada Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1242 / JP | [2012/03] |
Former [2004/46] | 01 /
Horiuchi, Makoto 2-17-2, Aoyama-kita Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-2221 / JP | ||
02 /
Hori, Masao 1-59-506, Kameyama Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-0973 / JP | |||
03 /
Yoshikawa, Tatsuya B612, 1736-3, Imajuku Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-0052 / JP | |||
04 /
Fukumoto, Atsushi 1947-6-210, Nishioka Uozumi-cho Akashi-shi Hyogo 674-0084 / JP | |||
05 /
Nakane, Takuji 931-11-F-201, Hamada Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1242 / JP | Representative(s) | Mai Besier European Trademark Attorneys Patentanwälte Kreuzberger Ring 18a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | Mai, Dörr, Besier Patentanwälte Steuerberater Wirtschaftsprüfer Postfach 4120 65031 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2012/03] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2004/46] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 04010143.8 | 29.04.2004 | [2004/46] | Priority number, date | JP20030127910 | 06.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003127910 | [2004/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1475141 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1475141 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
A63H33/16 (KR);
A63F9/1208 (KR);
A63H33/006 (KR);
A63H33/084 (KR);
A63H33/10 (KR);
B01D53/944 (EP,US);
B01J29/068 (EP,US);
B01J29/44 (EP,US);
B01J29/7415 (EP,US);
B01J37/0246 (EP,US);
G09B19/00 (KR);
A63F2009/1248 (KR);
B01J21/12 (EP,US);
B01J35/615 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2005/30] |
Former [2004/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Katalysator zur Reinigung von Dieselmotorabgasen und Verfahren zur dessen Herstellung | [2004/46] | English: | Catalyst for purifying diesel engine exhaust gas and method for production thereof | [2004/46] | French: | Catalyseur pour purifier de gaz d'échappement d'un moteur diesel et procédé de sa préparation | [2004/46] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 22.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.08.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 17.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2005 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Helbig, Christian, Dr. Chemin de la Croisette 42 1260 Nyon / CH Opponent's representative Helbig, Christian Wagner + Helbig Patentanwälte Pfarrstrasse 14 80538 München / DE | [2012/47] | 23.11.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.05.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.01.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 06.07.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/40] | Appeal following opposition | 26.03.2015 | Appeal received No. T0695/15 | 28.05.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.07.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 06.07.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.07.2017 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0935055 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-11* page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 29; figures 2,3; claim 9 *; | [X]US5943857 (ANSELL GRAHAM PAUL [GB], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 3, line 5 - line 31; claim - *; | [X]US2001043896 (DOMESLE RAINER [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038]; example -; claim - *; | [X]US2002086793 (LABARGE WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * claims 1-29 *; | [X]EP1287886 (OMG AG & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-11 * page 7, line 13 - line 32; claims 1-29 * |