EP1445034 - Method for producing an organic film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mino, Norihisa 10 -11-1703, Sugawara-cho Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0046 / JP | 02 /
Ebisawa, Mitsuo 16-307, Takanoharaeki-Nishidanchi 1-2, Kabutodai Kizucho Souraku-gun Kyoto 619-0224 / JP | 03 /
Oono, Yoshiaki 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 1-3-7 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 04 /
Ogawa, Kazufumi 2-3-50, Aoyama Nara-shi Nara 630-8101 / JP | [2006/12] |
Former [2004/40] | 01 /
Mino, Norihisa 10 -11-1703, Sugawara-cho Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0046 / JP | ||
02 /
Ebisawa, Mitsuo 16-307, Takanoharaeki-Nishidanchi 1-2, Kabutodai Kizucho Souraku-gun Kyoto 619-0224 / JP | |||
03 /
Oono, Yoshiaki 204, 3-bancho, Tsutsujigaokakita Nabari-shi Mie 518-0433 / JP | |||
04 /
Ogawa, Kazufumi 2-3-50, Aoyama Nara-shi Nara 630-8101 / JP | |||
Former [2004/33] | 01 /
Mino, Norihisa 8-1-30-B601, Ayameikeminami Nara-shi Nara 631-0033 / JP | ||
02 /
Ebisawa, Mitsuo 16-307, Takanoharaeki-Nishidanchi 1-2, Kabutodai Kizucho Souraku-gun Kyoto 619-0224 / JP | |||
03 /
Oono, Yoshiaki 204, 3-bancho, Tsutsujigaokakita Nabari-shi Mie 518-0433 / JP | |||
04 /
Ogawa, Kazufumi 2-3-50, Aoyama Nara-shi Nara 630-8101 / JP | Representative(s) | Schwarzensteiner, Marie-Luise, et al Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | Schwarzensteiner, Marie-Luise, Dr., et al Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04010197.4 | 16.08.2000 | [2004/33] | Priority number, date | JP19990244322 | 31.08.1999 Original published format: JP 24432299 | [2004/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1445034 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1445034 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1445034 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/18, B05D5/08 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B05C1/02 (EP,US);
B05C1/06 (EP,US);
B05D1/185 (EP,US);
B05D3/0486 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C03C17/28 (EP,US);
C03C17/30 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/4933 (EP,US);
C04B41/84 (EP,US);
B05C9/14 (EP,US);
B05D5/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT [2004/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines organischen Filmes | [2004/33] | English: | Method for producing an organic film | [2004/33] | French: | Procédé pour la production d'un film organique | [2004/33] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 15.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00117588.4 / EP1080794 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/42] | IT | 21.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5011518 (OGAWA KAZUFUMI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * page 1, lines 59-64 * * column 5, line 28 - line 30 * * examples 1,3,4 *; | [A]EP0841099 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 5 - line 8 * * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 32 * * examples 1-4 *; | [A]EP0848005 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1,2,9 *; | [X]EP0854389 (CORNING INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 1, line 29 - line 31 * * column 4, line 17 - line 18 * * column 4, line 33 - line 40 * * column 5, line 16 - line 30 * * column 5, line 39 - line 42 * * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 6 * * example 1 *; | [E]EP1132147 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-9 * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0139] ** paragraph [0155] - paragraph [0159] * |