EP1592251 - Ticker processing in video sequences [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Janssen, Frank Wernerplatz 5 63225 Langen / DE | 02 /
Salzer, Sven Hochweiseler Strasse 9 35510 Butzbach / DE | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04010304.6 | 30.04.2004 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1592251 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1592251 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/01, H04N5/44 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
H04N7/013 (EP,US);
E04B2/10 (KR);
H04N5/147 (EP,US);
H04N7/014 (EP,US);
H04N5/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/27] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bearbeitung von Tickern in Videosequenzen | [2005/44] | English: | Ticker processing in video sequences | [2005/44] | French: | Traitement de téléscripteurs dans des séquences vidéo | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 14.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0883298 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-26 * page 5, line 27 - page 7, line 7; figure 1 * * page 9, line 29 - page 11, line 9; figures 8-11 *; | [A]EP1006723 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP1198139 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-26 * paragraphs [0020] - [0023] - [0071] - [0073] *; | [A]EP1404130 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-26 * paragraphs [0052] - [0076] *; | [A] - YANG SEUNGJOON ET AL, Motion compensation assisted motion adaptive interlaced-to-progressive conversion, IEEE INT CONF IMAGE PROCESS; IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING 2003, VOL. 2, PAGE(S) 909 - 912, (2003), XP010669766 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * |