EP1453101 - Photoelectric X-ray converter, its driving method, and system including the photoelectric X-ray converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaifu, Noriyuki Canon K.K. 30-3, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Mizutani, Hidemasa Canon K.K. 30-3, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Takeda, Shinichi Canon K.K. 30-3, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Isao Canon K.K. 30-3, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Itabashi, Satoshi Canon K.K. 30-3, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/36] | Böckelen, Rainer Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04010709.6 | 27.12.1994 | [2004/36] | Priority number, date | JP19930331690 | 27.12.1993 Original published format: JP 33169093 | JP19940196640 | 22.08.1994 Original published format: JP 19664094 | JP19940196641 | 22.08.1994 Original published format: JP 19664194 | JP19940196642 | 22.08.1994 Original published format: JP 19664294 | JP19940196643 | 22.08.1994 Original published format: JP 19664394 | JP19940196644 | 22.08.1994 Original published format: JP 19664494 | JP19940196645 | 22.08.1994 Original published format: JP 19664594 | JP19940196648 | 22.08.1994 Original published format: JP 19664894 | JP19940196670 | 22.08.1994 Original published format: JP 19667094 | JP19940313392 | 16.12.1994 Original published format: JP 31339294 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1453101 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1453101 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
H01L27/1214 (EP,US);
G01T1/2928 (EP,US);
H01L21/84 (EP,US);
H01L27/14663 (EP,US);
H01L31/108 (EP,US);
H04N25/75 (EP,US);
H04N25/76 (EP,US);
H01L27/14609 (EP,US);
H01L27/14692 (EP,US);
H04N5/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/36] | Title | German: | Photoelektrischer Röntgenstrahlungsumwandler, sein Steuerverfahren und System mit diesem photoelektrischen Röntgenstrahlungsumwandler | [2004/36] | English: | Photoelectric X-ray converter, its driving method, and system including the photoelectric X-ray converter | [2004/36] | French: | Convertisseur photo-électrique de rayons X, sa méthode de commande et système comprenant ce convertisseur photo-électrique de rayons X | [2014/02] |
Former [2004/36] | Convertisseur photo- électrique de rayons X, sa méthode de commande et système comprenant ce convertisseur photo- électrique de rayons X | Examination procedure | 03.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 06.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94120730.0 / EP0660421 | Divisional application(s) | EP10184054.4 / EP2287911 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19940120730) is 21.11.2001 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4383327 (KRUGER ROBERT A) [X] 1-3 * column 6 - column 12; figures 3-4 *; | [X]DE3531448 (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 7, line 35 - page 16, line 15; figures 2-6 *; | [Y]EP0200272 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [Y] 3 * abstract *; | [XY]EP0441521 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-2 * column 1, line 1 - column 7, line 30; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3; | [XY]US5043582 (COX JOHN D [US], et al) [X] 1-2 * column 3, line 54 - column 10, line 5 * * column 3, line 39 - line 40 * * figures 1,12 * [Y] 3; | [Y]US5142557 (TOKER EMRE [US], et al) [Y] 3 * the whole document ** abstract *; | [X]WO9314418 (UNIV MICHIGAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 35, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-6 * * page 30, paragraph 2 *; | [A]EP0556820 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-2 * abstract * * pages 1-5; figure 13 * | Examination | WO9110921 | EP0523784 | by applicant | US4383327 | DE3531448 | EP0200272 | EP0441521 | US5043582 | US5142557 | WO9314418 |