EP1475294 - Spray-water protection for the wheels of goods vehicles. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Savelli, Aulo Via Kennedy, 66 61100 Pesaro / IT | For all designated states Grianti, Francesco San Rocco, 1 61100 Pesaro / IT | [2004/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Gustorf, Gerhard Bachstrasse 6a 84036 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Gustorf, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bachstrasse 6 A 84036 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 04010863.1 | 07.05.2004 | [2004/46] | Priority number, date | IT2003PS00019 | 08.05.2003 Original published format: IT PS20030019 | [2004/46] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1475294 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1475294 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/16 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
B62D25/168 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/34] |
Former [2004/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Spritzwasser-Abschirmung für die Räder von Lastkraftwagen | [2004/46] | English: | Spray-water protection for the wheels of goods vehicles. | [2004/46] | French: | Dispositif de protection contre les projections d'eau pour camions | [2004/46] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/10] | 06.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.07.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.07.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.07.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2605119 (EARNEST MAXWELL L) [X] 1-5,8,9 * figure - * * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 26 *; | [X]DE19529251 (STEYR NUTZFAHRZEUGE [AT]) [X] 1,4,6,7 * figures 5-10; claims 1,9-12,15 * * column 3, line 27 - line 57 *; | [X]US4445700 (SCHROEDER WARREN C [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * figure - * * column 1, line 20 - line 28 * * column 2, line 22 - line 50 *; | [X]FR442383 (JEAN BAPTISTE MORAND [FR]) [X] 1-4,8 * column W *; | [XP]JP2003146002 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030903), vol. 2003, no. 09, & JP2003146002 A 20030521 (NAKAGAWA RYOTARO) [XP] 1-4,6,7,9 * abstract * |