EP1491446 - Method and machine for wrapping a product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H. Böhl GmbH Mühlenweg 10 42499 Hückeswagen / DE | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brieden, Karlheinz Fürweg 5 42499 Hückeswagen / DE | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Müller, Enno, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Müller, Enno, Dipl.-Ing., et al Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 04010864.9 | 07.05.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | DE20031029193 | 28.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10329193 | [2005/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1491446 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1491446 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65B11/02 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
B65B11/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren sowie Wickelmaschine zum Umwickeln eines Gegenstandes | [2005/01] | English: | Method and machine for wrapping a product | [2005/01] | French: | Procédé et machine à banderoler | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 24.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.11.2009 | CZ | 11.11.2009 | DK | 11.11.2009 | EE | 11.11.2009 | FI | 11.11.2009 | IE | 11.11.2009 | NL | 11.11.2009 | PL | 11.11.2009 | RO | 11.11.2009 | SE | 11.11.2009 | SI | 11.11.2009 | SK | 11.11.2009 | TR | 11.11.2009 | BG | 11.02.2010 | GR | 12.02.2010 | PT | 11.03.2010 | AT | 07.05.2010 | LU | 07.05.2010 | HU | 12.05.2010 | BE | 31.05.2010 | CH | 31.05.2010 | LI | 31.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
NL | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
AT | 07.05.2010 | ||
LU | 07.05.2010 | ||
HU | 12.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
AT | 07.05.2010 | ||
LU | 07.05.2010 | ||
HU | 12.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
AT | 07.05.2010 | ||
HU | 12.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
AT | 07.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 11.11.2009 | |
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 11.11.2009 | |
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [AX]US4178734 (LANCASTER PATRICK R [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 15 - column 7, line 38; figure 1 * [X] 10; | [AX]EP0645305 (MAC AUT SRL [IT]) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 23 - column 4, line 9; figure 4 * [X] 10; | [DA]DE19955830 (BOEHL GMBH H [DE]) [DA] 1-18* the whole document * |