EP1475243 - Water-based ballpoint pen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PILOT INK CO., LTD. 3-17, Midorimachi Showa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [2009/28] |
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states THE PILOT INK CO., LTD. 3-17, Midorimachi Showa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takasu, Youichi The Pilot Ink Co., Ltd. 3-17, Midorimachi Showa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/46] | 01 /
Takasu, Yoichi The Pilot Ink Co., Ltd. 3-17, Midorimachi Showa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04010973.8 | 07.05.2004 | [2004/46] | Priority number, date | JP20030131066 | 09.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003131066 | [2004/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1475243 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1475243 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1475243 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B43K7/08, B43K7/00 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
B43K7/08 (EP,US);
B43K1/086 (EP,US);
B43K25/02 (EP,US);
B43K7/10 (EP,US);
B43K7/12 (EP,US);
C09D11/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/30] | B43K7/08 | ||
Former IPC [2004/46] | B43K7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/27] |
Former [2004/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kugelschreiber auf Wasserbasis | [2004/46] | English: | Water-based ballpoint pen | [2004/46] | French: | Stylo à bille à base aqueuse | [2004/46] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 29.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07021003.4 / EP1886836 | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4671691 (CASE LAURA K [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 10 - column 8, line 40 * * claims 1-13 *; | [X]US5048992 (LOFTIN RACHEL M [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 38 - column 8, line 66 *; | [X]US6132124 (OGURA NORIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 44 - line 59 ** example 1 *; | [PA]EP1413457 (PILOT INK CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-7 * the whole document * |