EP1492299 - Method of assisting an application to traverse a firewall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morgan, Dennis 23795 SE Summerhill Lane Issaquah, Washington 98029 / US | 02 /
Gavrilescu, Alexandru 23203 NE 78th Way Redmond, Washington 98053 / US | 03 /
Burstein, Jonathan L. 1614 Summit Avenue, No. 501 Seattle, Washington 98122 / US | 04 /
Shelest, Art 500 233rd Avenue NE Sammamish, Washington 98074 / US | 05 /
LeBlanc, David 20124 N. High Rock Road Monroe, Washington 98272 / US | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04011283.1 | 12.05.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | US20030603648 | 25.06.2003 Original published format: US 603648 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1492299 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1492299 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
H04L63/0227 (EP,US);
G06F15/00 (KR);
G06F11/00 (KR);
H04L63/029 (EP,US);
H04L63/0218 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Assistieren einer Anwendung beim Passieren einer Firewall | [2005/01] | English: | Method of assisting an application to traverse a firewall | [2005/01] | French: | Méthode pour assister une application à traverser un pare-feu | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/29] | 11.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0969368 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-37 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraphs [0011] , [0014] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0048] * * claims 1,9,10 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XP]US2004003290 (MALCOLM JERRY WALTER [US]) [XP] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [E]US2004128545 (CHAKRAVARTY VIJAYLAXMI [US]) [E] 1-37 * abstract * * figures 2-5 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0028] * * claims 1,3,8,9,10,15 *; | [A] - HUNT R, "Internet/Intranet firewall security-policy, architecture and transaction services", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0140-3664(98)00173-X, (19980901), vol. 21, no. 13, ISSN 0140-3664, pages 1107 - 1123, XP004146571 [A] 1-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-3664(98)00173-X |