EP1486597 - Shedding control method and device of a loom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TSUDAKOMA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa-ken / JP | [2008/21] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states TSUDAKOMA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirai, Jun 120-1, Taheiji 3-chome Nonoichi-machi Ishikawa-gun Ishikawa-ken / JP | [2008/10] |
Former [2004/51] | 01 /
Hirai, Jun 120-1, Taheiji 3-chome Nonoichi-machi Ishikawa-gun Ishigawa-ken / JP | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys., et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04011310.2 | 12.05.2004 | [2004/51] | Priority number, date | JP20030169033 | 13.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003169033 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1486597 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1486597 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1486597 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D03C13/00 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
D03C13/00 (EP);
D03C13/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, IT, LI [2006/07] |
Former [2004/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Fachbildungssteuerung einer Webmaschine | [2004/51] | English: | Shedding control method and device of a loom | [2004/51] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de commande de la formation de la foule de métier à tisser | [2004/51] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 26.11.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.03.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.01.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.01.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000064144 ; | [A]JPH1161591 ; | [AD]JP2000080533 ; | [A]EP0774538 (TSUDAKOMA IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP1065306 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [A] 1,4 * paragraph [0019]; figures 1-3; claims 1,5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, & JP2000064144 A 20000229 (TOYOTA AUTOM LOOM WORKS LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11061591 A 19990305 (TOYOTA AUTOM LOOM WORKS LTD) [A] * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000080533 A 20000321 (YAMADA DOBBY JAPAN:KK) [AD] * abstract * |