EP1477760 - Compound type heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 5-24-15, Minamidai, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 5-24-15, Minamidai, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamiyama, Naohisa c/o Calsonic Kansei Corporation 5-24-15, Minamidai Nakano-ku, Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Toshiharu c/o Calsonic Kansei Corporation 5-24-15, Minamidai Nakano-ku, Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04011569.3 | 14.05.2004 | [2004/47] | Priority number, date | JP20030137645 | 15.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003137645 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1477760 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1477760 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/04 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
F28D1/0443 (EP,US);
F28F13/00 (EP,US);
F28F2009/0287 (EP,US);
F28F2270/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/47] |
Former [2004/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbundwärmetauscher | [2004/47] | English: | Compound type heat exchanger | [2004/47] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur composé | [2004/47] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 13.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0859209 (ZEXEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 27 - column 4, line 2 * * column 5, line 22 - column 8, line 32 * * column 21, line 7 - column 25, line 42 ** figures 23-32 *; | [DA]JP2000018880 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US6394176 (MARSAIS CHRISTIAN [FR]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] - [0027] - [3038] - [0041] - [0054] - [0058] * * figure 4 *; | [PA]WO03106910 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [PA] 1-6 * page 11, line 5 - page 12, line 24 * * page 25, line 18 - page 29, line 6 * * figures 1,7-15 * | by applicant | JP2000018880 |