EP1457234 - Therapeutic light source and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Photo Therapeutics Limited 3rd Floor, Station House Stamford New Road Altrincham Cheshire WA14 1EP / GB | [2010/11] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Photo Therapeutics Limited 3rd Floor, Station House Stamford New Road Altrincham Cheshire WA14 1EP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitehurst, Colin Photo Ther. Ltd 3rd Floor, Station House Stamford New Road, Altrincham, Cheshire WA14 1EP / GB | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04011578.4 | 20.03.2001 | [2004/38] | Priority number, date | GB20000007085 | 23.03.2000 Original published format: GB 0007085 | GB20000009491 | 17.04.2000 Original published format: GB 0009491 | GB20000030974 | 19.12.2000 Original published format: GB 0030974 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1457234 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1457234 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1457234 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
A61N5/062 (EP,US);
A61N5/0613 (EP,US);
A61N2005/005 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0611 (EP);
A61N2005/0636 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0642 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0644 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0645 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0647 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0652 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0662 (EP,US);
A61N5/0601 (EP,US);
A61N5/0617 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2010/11] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | 01.06.2005 | LT | 01.06.2005 | LV | 01.06.2005 | MK | 01.06.2005 | RO | 01.06.2005 | SI | 01.06.2005 | Title | German: | Therapeutische Lichtquelle und Verfahren | [2004/38] | English: | Therapeutic light source and method | [2004/38] | French: | Source lumineuse thérapeutique et procédé | [2004/38] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 08.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01302586.1 / EP1138349 | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Request for further processing for: | 24.01.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 24.01.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.06.2005 | M01   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2010 | BE | 17.03.2010 | CY | 17.03.2010 | DK | 17.03.2010 | FI | 17.03.2010 | IT | 17.03.2010 | NL | 17.03.2010 | SE | 17.03.2010 | TR | 17.03.2010 | LU | 20.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | GR | 18.06.2010 | ES | 28.06.2010 | PT | 19.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
LU | 20.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE8813852U (NORMEDICA AG) [Y] 1-4 * page 5, line 11 - line 25 * * page 6, line 18 - line 23 * * page 7, line 21 - line 33 *; | [A]DE4113803 (IWG EASTMED MEDIZINTECHNIK GMB [DE]) [A] 13 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 7 ** column 2, line 57 - line 64; figure 2; claim 3 *; | [Y]WO9309847 (LARSEN ERIK [CH]) [Y] 1-4,14-19 * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 15 * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 7; figures 1,2; claims 1-5,8 *; | [XY]WO9321842 (QUADRA LOGIC TECH INC [CA], et al) [X] 5-7 * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 7 * * page 10, line 8 - line 24 * * page 11, line 12 - line 25 * * page 16, line 28 - page 17, line 3 * * page 18, line 4 - page 19, line 32; figures 5,10-12,14; claims 1-3 * [Y] 1-4,8,9,14-19; | [Y]US5278432 (IGNATIUS RONALD W [US], et al) [Y] 8,9 * column 2, line 3 - line 12 * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 20 * * column 5, line 4 - line 12 *; | [Y]WO9526217 (MAEF SRL [IT], et al) [Y] 15-19 * page 3, line 1 - line 19 * * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 26; claims 12-16 *; | [X]US5634711 (KENNEDY JOHN [CA], et al) [X] 5-7,9,17-19 * column 2, line 10 - line 27 * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 49 * * column 9, line 26 - line 30; figures 1,7; claims 1,6,7,14,15,18 *; | [A]US5913883 (ALEXANDER DANE [US], et al) [A] 1-4,7-19 * column 2, line 3 - line 60 * * column 3, line 8 - line 18 * * column 3, line 44 - line 52 *; | [Y]WO0002491 (HARTH YORAM [IL], et al) [Y] 15-19 * page 4, line 8 - line 11 * * page 4, line 29 - line 32 * * page 6, line 3 - line 6 * * page 12, line 17 - line 23; claim 12 * |