EP1477323 - Binder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARL MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 3-7-9, Tateishi, Katsushika-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states CARL MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 3-7-9, Tateishi, Katsushika-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Makoto Carl Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 3-7-9, Tateishi Katsushika-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kawachi, Hitoshi Carl Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 3-7-9, Tateishi Katsushika-ku Tokyo / JP | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04011580.0 | 14.05.2004 | [2004/47] | Priority number, date | JP20030137427 | 15.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003137427 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1477323 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B42B5/10 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
B42B5/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/31] |
Former [2004/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einband | [2004/47] | English: | Binder | [2004/47] | French: | Reliure | [2004/47] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 18.05.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.09.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.02.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1095788 (CARL MFG CO [JP]) [AD] 1-6* the whole document * |