EP1477432 - Slat conveyor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georg Koinzer GmbH & Co. KG Spinnereibedarf Robert-Bunsen-Strasse 15 36179 Bebra / DE | [2004/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koinzer, Gerald Gustav-Freytag-Strasse 10 36251 Bad Hersfeld / DE | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Walther Bayer Faber Patentanwälte PartGmbB Heimradstraße 2 34130 Kassel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | WALTHER, WALTHER & HINZ Patentanwälte Heimradstrasse 2 34130 Kassel / DE | Application number, filing date | 04011652.7 | 17.05.2004 | [2004/47] | Priority number, date | DE20031022216 | 16.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10322216 | [2004/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1477432 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1477432 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65G15/52, B65G15/42 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
B65G15/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/47] | Title | German: | Lattenförderband | [2004/47] | English: | Slat conveyor | [2004/47] | French: | Convoyeur à lattes | [2004/47] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 04.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2006
17.03.2006
ADMISSIBLE Hastem Transportbänder GmbH Oettinger Strasse 9 86720 Nördlingen / DE Opponent's representative Beier, Ralph, et al, et al V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestraße 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2006
Hastem Transportbänder GmbH Oettinger Strasse 9 86720 Nördlingen / DE Opponent's representative Beier, Ralph, et al, et al v. Bezold & Sozien Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | 26.04.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.04.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.05.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.05.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.06.2007 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.05.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.06.2005 | CZ | 22.06.2005 | EE | 22.06.2005 | FI | 22.06.2005 | GB | 22.06.2005 | IE | 22.06.2005 | NL | 22.06.2005 | PL | 22.06.2005 | RO | 22.06.2005 | SI | 22.06.2005 | SK | 22.06.2005 | TR | 22.06.2005 | BG | 22.09.2005 | DK | 22.09.2005 | GR | 22.09.2005 | SE | 22.09.2005 | PT | 29.11.2005 | HU | 23.12.2005 | LU | 17.05.2006 | ES | 31.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | AT | 17.05.2007 | BE | 31.05.2007 | FR | 31.05.2007 | DE | 01.12.2007 | IT | 17.05.2008 | [2009/40] |
Former [2009/29] | CY | 22.06.2005 | |
CZ | 22.06.2005 | ||
EE | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
GB | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
PL | 22.06.2005 | ||
RO | 22.06.2005 | ||
SI | 22.06.2005 | ||
SK | 22.06.2005 | ||
TR | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
HU | 23.12.2005 | ||
LU | 17.05.2006 | ||
ES | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
AT | 17.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
FR | 31.05.2007 | ||
DE | 01.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/02] | CY | 22.06.2005 | |
CZ | 22.06.2005 | ||
EE | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
GB | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
PL | 22.06.2005 | ||
RO | 22.06.2005 | ||
SI | 22.06.2005 | ||
SK | 22.06.2005 | ||
TR | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
HU | 23.12.2005 | ||
LU | 17.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
AT | 17.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
FR | 31.05.2007 | ||
DE | 01.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 22.06.2005 | |
EE | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
GB | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
PL | 22.06.2005 | ||
RO | 22.06.2005 | ||
SI | 22.06.2005 | ||
SK | 22.06.2005 | ||
TR | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
HU | 23.12.2005 | ||
LU | 17.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
AT | 17.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
FR | 31.05.2007 | ||
DE | 01.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 22.06.2005 | |
EE | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
GB | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
PL | 22.06.2005 | ||
RO | 22.06.2005 | ||
SI | 22.06.2005 | ||
SK | 22.06.2005 | ||
TR | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
HU | 23.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
AT | 17.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
FR | 31.05.2007 | ||
DE | 01.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CZ | 22.06.2005 | |
EE | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
GB | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
PL | 22.06.2005 | ||
RO | 22.06.2005 | ||
SI | 22.06.2005 | ||
SK | 22.06.2005 | ||
TR | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
HU | 23.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
AT | 17.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
DE | 01.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 22.06.2005 | |
EE | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
GB | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
PL | 22.06.2005 | ||
RO | 22.06.2005 | ||
SI | 22.06.2005 | ||
SK | 22.06.2005 | ||
TR | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
HU | 23.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
AT | 17.05.2007 | ||
BE | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | CZ | 22.06.2005 | |
EE | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
GB | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
PL | 22.06.2005 | ||
RO | 22.06.2005 | ||
SI | 22.06.2005 | ||
SK | 22.06.2005 | ||
TR | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
HU | 23.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
AT | 17.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CZ | 22.06.2005 | |
EE | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
GB | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
PL | 22.06.2005 | ||
RO | 22.06.2005 | ||
SI | 22.06.2005 | ||
SK | 22.06.2005 | ||
TR | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
HU | 23.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | CZ | 22.06.2005 | |
EE | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
GB | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
PL | 22.06.2005 | ||
SI | 22.06.2005 | ||
SK | 22.06.2005 | ||
TR | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
HU | 23.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | CZ | 22.06.2005 | |
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
GB | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
SI | 22.06.2005 | ||
SK | 22.06.2005 | ||
TR | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/31] | CZ | 22.06.2005 | |
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
GB | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
SI | 22.06.2005 | ||
SK | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | CZ | 22.06.2005 | |
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
GB | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
SI | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | CZ | 22.06.2005 | |
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
GB | 22.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
SI | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | CZ | 22.06.2005 | |
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
GB | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
SI | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | CZ | 22.06.2005 | |
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
GB | 22.06.2005 | ||
SI | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 22.06.2005 | |
GB | 22.06.2005 | ||
SI | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 22.06.2005 | |
GB | 22.06.2005 | ||
SI | 22.06.2005 | ||
BG | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 22.06.2005 | |
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 22.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2239626 (OBERMAIER PAUL) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [AD]DE3445125 (HASTEM MUELLER HUGO STEFAN) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [AD]US6105758 (WOOD PETER JAMES [GB]) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document * | Examination | AT237517B |