EP1480023 - Measurement device with apparatus for recognition of connected ultrasonic sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co. KG Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | [2010/27] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co. KG. Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spanke, Dietmar, Dr. Bannweg 3 79585 Steinen / DE | 02 /
Steltner, Holger, Dr. Eulenweg 26 79110 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
Peter, Fabrice 8 rue de Michelbach 68730 Blotzheim / FR | 04 /
Ottenbreit, Bernhard Hauptstrasse 169 79739 Schörstadt / DE | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2004/48] | Andres, Angelika Endress + Hauser (DE) Holding GmbH + Co., PatServe - Patentabteilung Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 04011707.9 | 18.05.2004 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | DE20031023062 | 20.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10323062 | [2004/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1480023 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1480023 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01F25/00, G01R31/28, G01F23/296 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
G01F23/2968 (EP,US);
G01F25/24 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02836 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/33] |
Former [2004/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Messgerät mit Vorrichtung zur Erkennung des angeschlossenenen Ultraschallsensors | [2004/48] | English: | Measurement device with apparatus for recognition of connected ultrasonic sensor | [2004/48] | French: | Appareil de mesure avec dispositif pour l'identification d'un capteur ultrasonore connecté | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 25.05.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.09.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.02.2010 | 03.02.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.07.2010 | [2011/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4467271 (RUCKENBAUER FRIEDRICH [AT], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * * column 1, line 18 - column 5, line 60 * [A] 4,6-8; | [XA]DE4232719 (VEGA GRIESHABER GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 36 - column 5, line 38 * [A] 8; | [A]US5625343 (ROTTMAR WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract ** column 1, line 47 - column 4, line 59 *; | [XA]US2003038644 (KLEVEN LOWELL A [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028] * [A] 4,6-8 | by applicant | DE4232719 |