EP1484151 - Foaming mould an intermediate component made therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2009 | Change - representative | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArvinMeritor GmbH Albert-Einstein-Strasse 14-20 63128 Dietzenbach / DE | [2004/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ludwig, Matthias Kolping Strasse 3a 38159 Vechelde / DE | 02 /
Lutz, Marcus Krümmeweg 2c 38518 Gifhorn / DE | 03 /
Niebuhr, Frank Kettelfeldring 12 38518 Wilsche / DE | 04 /
Batke, Harald Im Wildgarten 10a 38539 Gerstenbüttel / DE | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Sties, Jochen Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Sties, Jochen Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/50] | Sties, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04011802.8 | 18.05.2004 | [2004/50] | Priority number, date | DE2003125619 | 05.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10325619 | [2004/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1484151 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1484151 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/58, B29C44/34, B29C44/12, B29C45/14 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
B29C44/58 (EP,US);
B29C44/1252 (EP,US);
B29C44/3411 (EP,US);
B29C44/14 (EP);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249987 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/50] | B29C44/58, B29C44/34, B29C44/12 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/36] |
Former [2004/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schäumwerkzeug und damit hergestelltes Zwischenerzeugnis | [2004/50] | English: | Foaming mould an intermediate component made therein | [2004/50] | French: | Moule de moussage et élément intermédiaire fabriqué dans ledit moule | [2004/50] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/14] | 14.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AT335723B (KAMLANDER LUDWIG DR) [X] 7,9 * page 2, paragraph L; figure 3 *; | [X]JPS57176137 (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO) [X] 11* abstract *; | [X]JPH09136353 (SEKISUI PLASTICS, et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * |