EP1484829 - Motor, in particular its fastening [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co.KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Börkel, Timo Wilhelm-Schmid-Strasse 23 74336 Brackenheim / DE | 02 /
Philippin, Erich Franklinstrasse 85 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Wartbergstrasse 14 70191 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Grauel, Andreas Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Presselstrasse 10 70191 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04011849.9 | 19.05.2004 | [2004/50] | Priority number, date | DE20031025502 | 04.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10325502 | [2004/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1484829 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1484829 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/00 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
H02K5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Title | German: | Motor, insbesondere dessen Befestigung | [2004/50] | English: | Motor, in particular its fastening | [2004/50] | French: | Moteur, notamment sa fixation | [2004/50] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 08.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.03.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 31.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/33] | 10.05.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/33] | Appeal following examination | 18.05.2015 | Appeal received No. T2033/15 | 10.08.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.05.2020 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2020/19] | 11.09.2020 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2020/37] | 10.05.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 15.06.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 10.05.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3787014 (PATEL A, et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 45; figures 1,2 *; | [X]JPS5826542 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [X] 1* abstract *; | [X]EP0458248 (NCR CO [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 11 * * column 3, line 32 - line 49; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE4319705 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 5, line 37 - line 55; figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO0048293 (SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE CORP LP [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 7, line 12 - line 20; figures 2,3 *; | [X]EP1216862 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0017]; figure 4 * | Examination | GB1125069 | GB2086145 | GB2327817 |