EP1604970 - 2-(Biphenyl-3-yl)-carboxylic acids of gamma-secretase-modulating activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CELLZOME AG Meyerhofstrasse 1 69117 Heidelberg / DE | [2005/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramsden, Nigel Sparrows Lodge, Green Lane Fowlmere, Royston, Herts SG8 7QP / GB | 02 /
Wilson, Francis 71 Moorlands, Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 4QJ / GB | 03 /
Reid, Alison Marlborough House, 60 High Street Cottenham, CB4 8SA / GB | 04 /
Reader, Valerie 5 Coles Lane Linton, Cambridge CB1 6JS / GB | 05 /
Miller, Warren 5 Saffron Court, Station Rd Saffron Walden, Essex, CB11 3HB / GB | 06 /
Harrison, Richard John 5 Saffron Court, Sation Rd Saffron Walden, Essex, CB11 3HB / GB | 07 /
Sunose, Mihiro 33 Brewery Road Pampisford, Cambridge, CB2 4EN / GB | 08 /
Hernandez-Perni, Remedios 1 Hulatt Rd Cambridge CB1 8TH / GB | 09 /
Major, Jeremy 10 Chigwell Court Cambridge CB5 8TY / GB | 10 /
Boussard, Cyrille 32 Hornbook, Saffron Place, Radwinter RD Saffron Walden, Essex CB11 3JN / GB | 11 /
Smelt, Kathryn 25 Rosebery Court Rosebery Avenue, London, EC1R 5HP / GB | 12 /
Taylor, Jess 12 The Coppens Stotfold, Hitchin, Hertfordshire SG5 4PJ / GB | 13 /
LeFormal, Adeline 14 Ozier Court Saffron Walden CB11 4BH / GB | 14 /
Cansfield, Andrew 4 The Limes, Harston Cambridge CB2 5QT / GB | 15 /
Burckhardt, Svenja 2 Grapevine Cottages Boxworth, Cambridge CB3 8NG / GB | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Huhn, Michael, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Huhn, Michael, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04011851.5 | 19.05.2004 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604970 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07C57/58, A61K31/192, A61P25/28 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
C07C57/58 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07C59/64 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2006/34] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | 2-(Biphenyl-3-yl)-carbonsäuren mit gamma-Sekretase-modulierender Wirkung | [2005/50] | English: | 2-(Biphenyl-3-yl)-carboxylic acids of gamma-secretase-modulating activity | [2005/50] | French: | Acides 2-(biphenyl-3-yl)-carboxyliques avec une activité modulante de gamma-secretase | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/09] | 10.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.07.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.07.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS56123935 ; | [X]WO0178721 (MAYO FOUNDATION [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13 * Abstract; page 2, line 26 to page 3, line 8; claims 1, 5, 6. *; | [X]WO03055860 (RIBOTARGETS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,12 * Pages 131-132: 4'-fluoro-biphenyl-4-ylacetic acid. *; | [E]WO2004073705 (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT], et al) [E] 1-11,13* Abstract; claims; examples. *; | [X] - MAITRA, U.; BRESLOW, R., "Conversion of the Cholesterol Sidechain to a 17-Acetyl Group by Remote Chlorination Reactions", TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1986), vol. 27, no. 27, pages 3087 - 3090, XP002311404 [X] 1,2 * Page 3089, compounds 4, 6; and compounds occurring in the conversion from 4 to 5. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)84722-X | [X] - BUCHECKER, RICHARD ET AL, "Some studies on liquid crystals incorporating three membered linking units combined with 1,3 linked rings", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1996:338710, URL: STN, XP002311407 [X] 1,2 * Abstract and CAS-RN 178812-91-4. * | [XY] - TAMURA, Y. ET AL., "Nonsteroidal Antiinflammatory Agents. 2.", J. MED. CHEM., (1981), vol. 24, pages 43 - 47, XP002311405 [X] 1,2,4,5,11,13 * Compounds 4h, 4j, 4p, 4q, 5h, 5j, 5p, and 5q. * [Y] 6-10,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00133a010 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811224), vol. 0052, no. 04, Database accession no. (C - 085), & JP56123935 A 19810929 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5,11,13 * Abstract. * [Y] 6-10,12 | [YD] - ROGERS J ET AL, "CLINICAL TRIAL OF INDOMETHACIN IN ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE", NEUROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, PHILADELPHIA, US, (199308), vol. 43, no. 8, ISSN 0028-3878, pages 1609 - 1611, XP002070235 [YD] 6-10,12 * Abstract; discussion. * | [YD] - ERIKSEN, J. L. ET AL., "NSAIDs and enantiomers of flurbiprofen target gamma-secretase and lower A-beta-42 in vivo", J. CLIN. INVEST., (2003), vol. 112, no. 3, pages 440 - 449, XP002311406 [YD] 6-10,12 * The whole document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI200318162 |