EP1479548 - Automobile servo motor controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/48] | Automobile servermotor controller | ||
[2012/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | [2013/12] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sunaga, Hideki Calsonic Kansei Corporation 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | 02 /
Araki, Futoshi Calsonic Kansei Corporation 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Kaoru Calsonic Kansei Corporation 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | [2012/43] |
Former [2004/48] | 01 /
Sunaga, Hideki Calsonic Kansei Corp. 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | ||
02 /
Araki, Futoshi Calsonic Kansei Corp. 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | |||
03 /
Tanaka, Kaoru Calsonic Kansei Corp. 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04012113.9 | 21.05.2004 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | JP20030145411 | 22.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003145411 | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1479548 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1479548 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
B60H1/00835 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/33] |
Former [2004/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugservomotorsteuerung | [2004/48] | English: | Automobile servo motor controller | [2012/41] | French: | Dispositif de commande de servomoteur d'un véhicule automobile | [2004/48] |
Former [2004/48] | Automobile servermotor controller | Examination procedure | 13.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 27.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH106748 ; | [A]EP0300722 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [Y]US4974776 (OSHIZAWA HIDEKAZU [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, lines 7-9; figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 43 - column 6, line 3; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]EP0773488 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0820886 (CALSONIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, lines 7-9; figure 1 * * column 2, line 28 - column 6, line 33; claims 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10006748 A 19980113 (CALSONIC CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |