EP1487116 - Turbo decoding device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuwahara, Yuji 4-1-18-102, Sahara Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 239-0835 / JP | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04012375.4 | 25.05.2004 | [2004/51] | Priority number, date | JP20030164120 | 09.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003164120 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1487116 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1487116 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/29, H03M13/27, H03M13/45 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
H03M13/3927 (EP,US);
H03M13/27 (EP,US);
H03M13/296 (EP,US);
H03M13/2978 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/40] |
Former [2004/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Turbodekodierungsvorrichtung | [2004/51] | English: | Turbo decoding device | [2004/51] | French: | Dispositif de décodage turbo | [2004/51] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 11.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6292918 (SINDHUSHAYANA NAGABHUSHANA T [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 1 ** column 7, line 19 - line 45 *; | [A]US6360345 (KIM SANG WU [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 1a * * figure 3a *; | [A] - JUNG P ET AL, "Comprehensive comparison of turbo-code decoders", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1995 IEEE 45TH CHICAGO, IL, USA 25-28 JULY 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19950725), ISBN 0-7803-2742-X, pages 624 - 628, XP010167017 [A] 1-13 * figure 1 * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1995.504943 | [A] - WU P H-Y ET AL, "IMPLEMENTATION OF A LOW COMPLEXITY, LOW POWER, INTEGER-BASED TURBO DECODER", GLOBECOM'01. 2001 IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. SAN ANTONIO, TX, NOV. 25 - 29, 2001, IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20011125), VOL. 2 OF 6, ISBN 0-7803-7206-9, pages 946 - 951, XP001099245 [A] 1-13 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.2001.965558 | [A] - ZHONGFENG WANG ET AL, "Area-efficient high-speed decoding schemes for turbo decoders", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VERY LARGE SCALE INTEGRATION (VLSI) SYSTEMS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200212), vol. 10, no. 6, ISSN 1063-8210, pages 902 - 912, XP002335788 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TVLSI.2002.808451 |