EP1502933 - Toner comprising hydrophobic inorganic fine particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/05] | Hydrophobic inorganic fine particles, hydrophobic inorganic fine particles production process, and toner | ||
[2010/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/36] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Yoshihiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kasuya, Takashige Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Hiratsuka, Kaori Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/05] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04012484.4 | 26.05.2004 | [2005/05] | Priority number, date | JP20030203865 | 30.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003203865 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1502933 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1502933 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1502933 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09C3/12, G03G9/097 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
G03G9/09725 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C09C1/3081 (EP,US);
C09C1/3684 (EP,US);
G03G9/09708 (EP,US);
G03G9/09716 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/25] |
Former [2005/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hydrophobische, inorganische Teilchen enthaltender Toner | [2010/10] | English: | Toner comprising hydrophobic inorganic fine particles | [2010/10] | French: | Toner contenant des particules inorganiques hydrophobes | [2010/10] |
Former [2005/05] | Hydrophobische inorganische Teilchen, Herstellungsverfahren hydrophobischer, inorganischer Teilchen und Toner | ||
Former [2005/05] | Hydrophobic inorganic fine particles, hydrophobic inorganic fine particles production process, and toner | ||
Former [2005/05] | Particules inorganiques hydrophobes, procédé pour la production de particules inorganiques hydrophobes et révélateurs | Examination procedure | 10.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 11.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JPH06313980 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [DX] 1-14 * abstract * * example 3 *; | [DX]JPH06332235 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD) [DX] 1-14 * abstract *; | [DX]JPH0792724 (TOSHIBA CORP) [DX] 1-14 * abstract *; | [DX]JPH07104501 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD) [DX] 1-14 * abstract * * example 2 *; | [A]EP0971273 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-14* abstract * |