EP1493908 - Control system for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasui, Yuji c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Yonekawa, Akiyuki c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2008/33] |
Former [2005/01] | 01 /
* * * | ||
02 /
* * * | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04012784.7 | 28.05.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | JP20030191442 | 03.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003191442 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1493908 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1493908 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | [2008/23] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1493908 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/06, F02D13/02, F02D41/02 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
F02D13/0211 (EP,US);
F01L1/08 (EP,US);
F01L1/18 (EP,US);
F01L1/3442 (EP,US);
F01L13/0047 (EP,US);
F02D13/023 (EP,US);
F02D13/0246 (EP,US);
F02D41/0002 (EP,US);
F02D41/0255 (EP,US);
F02D41/062 (EP,US);
F01L2001/34483 (EP,US);
F01L2201/00 (EP,US);
F01L2800/00 (EP,US);
F01L2820/02 (EP,US);
F02D2041/001 (EP,US);
F02D2041/1416 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0402 (EP,US);
F02D31/002 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2009/07] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Regelvorrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine | [2005/01] | English: | Control system for internal combustion engine | [2005/01] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour un moteur à combustion interne | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 27.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/21] | 07.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2308990 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB]) [X] 4 * page 2, line 31 - line 15 *; | [X]EP0859130 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 7 * * column 14, line 55 - column 15, line 48 *; | [X]JP2001263050 (DENSO CORP) [X] 7 * abstract *; | [X]US2002062800 (SHIMIZU HIROKAZU [JP]) [X] 4,6,7,10 * paragraphs [0028] - [0034] - [0043] - [0047] *; | [X]US2003070637 (MAJIMA YOSHIHIRO [JP]) [X] 7,10* paragraphs [0071] - [0079]; figures 8,16A-16C *; | [PX]EP1350936 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1 * paragraph [0020] *; | [PX]EP1363002 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [PX] 1 * paragraphs [0025] , [0045] , [0053] , [0064] , [0065]; figures 11-13 *; | [PX]EP1403512 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [PX] 1,2 * paragraph [0078]; figure 10 *; | [EX]WO2004061274 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [EX] 1,2 * page 12, line 3 - line 8 * | by applicant | EP0859130 | EP1403512 | WO2004061274 |