EP1515379 - Accumulator battery container with plate insertion system, and plate inserting method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACCUMA S.p.A. Via Eustachi, 46 20129 Milano / IT | [2005/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rivetta, Cesare Cascina Morosina 45 20065 Inzago (Milano) / IT | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/11] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04012891.0 | 01.06.2004 | [2005/11] | Priority number, date | IT2003MI01751 | 11.09.2003 Original published format: IT MI20031751 | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1515379 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1515379 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/02, H01M2/10, H01M10/16, H01M10/04 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
H01M10/0413 (EP,US);
H01M10/16 (EP,US);
H01M50/103 (EP,US);
H01M50/114 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP);
Y10T29/49108 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/11] | H01M2/02, H01M2/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/11] | Extension states | HR | 15.11.2006 | Title | German: | Akkumulatorbatteriebehälter mit Platte Einfügungsystem und Platteeinfügungsmethode | [2005/11] | English: | Accumulator battery container with plate insertion system, and plate inserting method | [2005/11] | French: | Le récipient de pile d'accumulateur avec le système d'insertion de plaque, et la plaque insérant la méthode | [2005/11] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 23.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 06.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2154841 (LAWRENCE GILL WALTER) [X] 1,2,8-10,15,16 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 46 * * column 3, lines 20-31 ** figures 1-4 *; | [X]GB1349648 (VARTA AG) [X] 1,2,8,14-16,21,22 * the whole document *; | [X]US4384031 (KLINE RICHARD H) [X] 1,2,8,14-16,21-23 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 54 * * figures 1-8 *; | [X]DE19738087 (VB AUTOBATTERIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10,12,15,16,18,19 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 18; figure 1 *; | [X]US6376126 (FAUST HELMUTH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,14-16,21,22 * the whole document * |