EP1494231 - Clamping mechanism of disc unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORION ELECTRIC CO., Ltd. 41-1 Iehisa-Cho Takefu-City Fukui 915-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states ORION ELECTRIC CO., Ltd. 41-1 Iehisa-Cho Takefu-City, Fukui 915-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Azai, Kouji Orion Electric Co., Ltd. 41-1 Iehisa-cho Takefu-city Fukui 915-8555 / JP | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04012906.6 | 01.06.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | JP20030186426 | 30.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003186426 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494231 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/028 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
G11B17/0285 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/38] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Klemmvorrichtung einer Platteneinheit | [2005/01] | English: | Clamping mechanism of disc unit | [2005/01] | French: | Dispositif de serrage d'unité à disque | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 28.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/44] | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP7244908 ; | [A]JPH11238278 ; | [X]US4570194 (SCHATTEMAN ETIENNE A [BE]) [X] 1-3 * column 5, line 47 - column 8, line 27; figures 5-10 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 1996, no. 01, & JP7244908 A 19950919 (TANASHIN DENKI CO) [AD] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, & JP11238278 A 19990831 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |