EP1455302 - Method for manufacturing an IC element including a coil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI MAXELL, LTD. 1-88, Ushitora 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8567 / JP | [2007/20] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Hitachi Maxell Limited 1-88, Ushitora 1-chome Ibaraki-shi 567-0877 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawamura, Satoshi 1-28F1202, Deiki Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0021 / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Shin 217-5, Noborito Tma-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 214-0014 / JP | [2004/47] |
Former [2004/37] | 01 /
Kawamura, Satoshi 1-28F1202, Deiki Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0021 / JP | ||
02 /
Shimizu, Shin Akuhiruzu 304 141 Noboritoshinmachi Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 214-0013 / JP | Representative(s) | Merryweather, Colin Henry J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | Merryweather, Colin Henry J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04013387.8 | 23.02.2000 | [2004/37] | Priority number, date | JP19990046545 | 24.02.1999 Original published format: JP 4654599 | JP19990059753 | 08.03.1999 Original published format: JP 5975399 | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1455302 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1455302 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07, H01L23/50 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
G06K19/07775 (EP,US);
H01L25/00 (KR);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K19/07779 (EP,US);
H01L23/49855 (EP,US);
H01L23/5227 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von integrierten Schaltungselementen mit Spule | [2007/20] | English: | Method for manufacturing an IC element including a coil | [2004/37] | French: | Procédé de produire des circuits intégrés comportant une bobine | [2004/37] |
Former [2004/37] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Integrierten Schaltungselementen mit Spule | Examination procedure | 24.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 22.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00905288.7 / EP1193759 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6194339 ; | [A]JPS6116591 ; | [A]WO9208209 (JURISCH REINHARD [DE]) [A] 1-3 * page 3, line 10 - page 3, line 32 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP8222695 A 19960830 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860916), vol. 0102, no. 72, Database accession no. (E - 437), & JP61094339 A 19860513 (ROHM CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860611), vol. 0101, no. 64, Database accession no. (E - 410), & JP61016591 A 19860124 (ROOMU KK) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |