EP1538435 - Refractometer and method for measuring refractive index [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WYATT TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 6300 Hollister Avenue Santa Barbara, CA 93117 / US | [2009/34] |
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states Wyatt Technology Corporation 6300 Hollister Avenue Santa Barbara, CA 93117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larkin, Michael I. 825 Jennings St. Santa Barbara CA 93103 / US | [2005/23] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04013578.2 | 09.06.2004 | [2005/23] | Priority number, date | US20030723548 | 25.11.2003 Original published format: US 723548 | [2005/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1538435 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1538435 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1538435 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/41 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
G01N21/4133 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/10] |
Former [2005/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Refraktometer und Verfahren zur absoluten und relativen Messung des Brechungsindexes | [2005/23] | English: | Refractometer and method for measuring refractive index | [2005/23] | French: | Réfractomètre et méthode de mesure de l'indice de réfraction relatif et absolu | [2009/04] |
Former [2005/23] | Réfractomètre et méthode de mesure de l'indice de réfraction relative et absolue | Examination procedure | 17.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 08.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2427996 (WILLIAM SEAMAN) [A] 1-11 * figure 2 *; | [X]US2741942 (HARRY SVENSSON SVANTE) [X] 1,3 * figure 1 *; | [X]US2800053 (HARRY SVENSSON SVANTE) [X] 5 * figure 4 *; | [A]EP0682242 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1-11* figure 4a * |