EP1494048 - Light curtain [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2007/07] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Sick AG Sebastian-Kneipp-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch, Breisgau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beck, Michael Dettenbachstrasse 18 79183 Waldkirch / DE | 02 /
Rieger, Daniel Fabrikstrasse 16 79102 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
Haberstroh, Frank Dobel 13 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/01] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04013611.1 | 09.06.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | DE20031029881 | 02.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10329881 | [2005/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494048 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1494048 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01V8/20, F16P3/14, B23Q5/58 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
F16P3/144 (EP,US);
G01V8/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | Lichtgitter | [2005/01] | English: | Light curtain | [2005/01] | French: | Rideau de lumière | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/20] | 23.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2006 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2004 | CY | 07.11.2012 | CZ | 07.11.2012 | DK | 07.11.2012 | EE | 07.11.2012 | FI | 07.11.2012 | MC | 07.11.2012 | NL | 07.11.2012 | PL | 07.11.2012 | RO | 07.11.2012 | SE | 07.11.2012 | SI | 07.11.2012 | SK | 07.11.2012 | TR | 07.11.2012 | BG | 07.02.2013 | GR | 08.02.2013 | ES | 18.02.2013 | PT | 07.03.2013 | AT | 09.06.2013 | GB | 09.06.2013 | IE | 09.06.2013 | LU | 09.06.2013 | BE | 30.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
TR | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
AT | 09.06.2013 | ||
GB | 09.06.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
AT | 09.06.2013 | ||
GB | 09.06.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
GB | 09.06.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 07.11.2012 | |
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 07.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA1093192 (GEN ELECTRIC CANADA) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [XA]US4430568 (YOSHIDA OSAMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8-13 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - line 48 * [A] 3-5,7; | [X]US5065418 (BERMBACH RAINER [DE], et al) [X] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]US5243183 (BARRON JR KENNETH L [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract ** column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 6 *; | [DXA]DE4422497 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [DX] 1,2,6,8-13 * the whole document * * column 2, line 18 - line 23; claims 1,6 * [A] 3-5,7; | [XA]DE4424537 (SICK OPTIK ELEKTRONIK ERWIN [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,8-13 * abstract * * column 1, line 25 - line 37 * * column 2, line 12 - line 28 * * column 5, line 5 - line 40 * [A] 4,5,7 |