EP1486332 - Printer module with on-board intelligence [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department Xerox Square - 20 A 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | ||
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rommelmann, Heiko 63 Stone Island Lane Penfield, NY 14526 / US | 02 /
Rodriguez, Alberto 624 Morning Glory Drive Webster, NY 14580 / US | 03 /
Bell, Scott J. 128 Country Manor Way 9 Webster, NY 14580 / US | 04 /
Kuyt, Edwin 3759 Huntley Road, Lot 83 Marion, New York 14505-9758 / US | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04013746.5 | 11.06.2004 | [2004/51] | Priority number, date | US20030458848 | 11.06.2003 Original published format: US 458848 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1486332 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1486332 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
B41J2/17546 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/36] |
Former [2004/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckermodul mit eingebauter Intelligenz | [2004/51] | English: | Printer module with on-board intelligence | [2004/51] | French: | Module d'impression utilisant de l'intelligence embarquée | [2004/51] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 01.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9000974 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]US5365312 (HILLMANN RUEDIGER [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 41 - column 5, line 40; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0780786 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1,8-10 * column 11, line 17 - line 45; figure 7 *; | [X]US2001007458 (PURCELL DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0035]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040]; figures 4,5 *; | [X]EP1153752 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045]; figure 3 *; | [X]US2002012541 (TAKEMOTO KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0220] - paragraph [0223] *; | [X]EP1211081 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0040]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047]; figure 6 *; | [X]US6532351 (RICHARDS AUSTIN L [GB], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 16; figure 2 *; | [A]US2003095724 (KIA SILVERBROOK [AU], et al); | [PX]EP1389531 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-10 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US6532351 |