EP1480068 - Array-type light modulation element, drive method thereof, and flat-panel display unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koichi, Kimura c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 200 Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka / JP | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04013886.9 | 19.01.2000 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | JP19990012043 | 20.01.1999 Original published format: JP 1204399 | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1480068 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1480068 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/02, G09F9/37 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
G02B26/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/33] |
Former [2004/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gitterartige Lichtmodulationsvorrichtung, Ansteuerungsverfahren davon, und flache Anzeigetafel | [2004/48] | English: | Array-type light modulation element, drive method thereof, and flat-panel display unit | [2004/48] | French: | Dispositif de modulation de la lumière du type réseau, sa méthode de commande, et dispositif d'affichage à panneau plat | [2005/49] |
Former [2004/48] | Dispositif de modulation de la lumiére du type réseau, sa méthode de commande, et dispositif d'affichage à panneau plat | Examination procedure | 14.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 18.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00101013.1 / EP1022598 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8601626 (SIMPSON GEORGE R, et al) [Y] 1-5,9,11,12,15-17 * page 5, lines 2-10; figure 2 * * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 5; figure 5 *; | [Y]US5062689 (KOEHLER DALE R [US]) [Y] 1-5,9-12,15-26 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 49; figure 2 * * column 6, line 42 - column 6, line 68; figure 16 * * column 5, line 47 - column 5, line 51 * * column 1, lines 54-58 * * column 2, lines 53-62 *; | [Y]WO9819201 (XEOTRON CORP [US], et al) [Y] 10* page 10, line 1 - page 12, line 10; figure 3 *; | [Y]WO9857318 (DIELECTRIC SYST INT [US]) [Y] 18-26 * page 9, lines 6-16; figure 2 * * page 15, line 3 * * page 20, line 32 - page 21, line 14 *; | [A] - JAECKLIN V P ET AL, "LINE-ADDRESSABLE TORSIONAL MICROMIRROS FOR LIGHT MODULATOR ARRAYS", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (19940401), vol. A41, no. 1/3, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 324 - 329, XP000450049 [A] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0924-4247(94)80131-2 |