EP1488951 - Seat structure for a vehicle and vehicle provided therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | ||
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakaya, Kouichi Mazda Motor Corp. 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
Muramatsu, Kenji Mazda Motor Corp. 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04014017.0 | 15.06.2004 | [2004/52] | Priority number, date | JP20030176109 | 20.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003176109 | JP20030176135 | 20.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003176135 | JP20030176152 | 20.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003176152 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1488951 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1488951 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/30, B60N2/06 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
B60N2/3013 (EP,US);
B60N2/06 (EP,US);
B60N2/062 (EP,US);
B60N2/065 (EP,US);
B60N2/3065 (EP,US);
B60N2/309 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2005/37] |
Former [2004/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugsitzstruktur und damit ausgerüstetes Fahrzeug | [2004/52] | English: | Seat structure for a vehicle and vehicle provided therewith | [2004/52] | French: | Structure de siège pour véhicule et véhicule ainsi équipé | [2004/52] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 18.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003118438 ; | [AD]JPH10203210 ; | [A]US5542745 (TAKEDA NOBUHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]FR2735081 (PEUGEOT [FR]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 26 - page 6, line 21; figures 1-8 *; | [A]WO02100678 (TS TECH CO LTD [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030806), vol. 2003, no. 08, & JP2003118438 A 20030423 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10203210 A 19980804 (TAKASHIMAYA NIPPATSU KOGYO KK; NHK SPRING CO LTD) [AD] * abstract * | by applicant | JPH10203210 | JP2000006698 |