EP1498612 - Turbo molecular pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfeiffer Vacuum GmbH Berlinerstrasse 43 35614 Asslar / DE | [2015/31] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Pfeiffer Vacuum GmbH Berlinerstrasse 43 35614 Asslar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stanzel, Jörg Am Pfeiffer 3 35583 Wetzlar / DE | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Knefel, Cordula Patentanwälte Knefel & Knefel Postfach 19 24 35529 Wetzlar / DE | [2015/31] |
Former [2012/29] | Knefel, Cordula Patentanwälte Knefel & Knefel Postfach 19 24 35529 Wetzlar / DE | Application number, filing date | 04014174.9 | 17.06.2004 | [2005/03] | Priority number, date | DE2003131932 | 15.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10331932 | [2005/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1498612 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1498612 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1498612 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F04D19/04 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
F04D29/542 (EP,US);
F04D19/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/31] |
Former [2005/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Turbomolekularpumpe | [2005/03] | English: | Turbo molecular pump | [2005/03] | French: | Pompe turbomoléculaire | [2005/03] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 26.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2004 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | ES | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | NL | 29.07.2015 | PL | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SK | 29.07.2015 | TR | 29.07.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 17.06.2004 | |
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 17.06.2004 | |
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 29.07.2015 | |
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | DK | 29.07.2015 | |
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | DK | 29.07.2015 | |
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | DK | 29.07.2015 | |
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | ES | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
GR | 30.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2523390 (PFEIFFER VAKUUMTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1-6* figures 1-5 *; | [X]JPH04330397 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract *; | [X]US2001016160 (IKEGAMI TETSUMA [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * * figures 5-11 * | by applicant | DE2523390 | DE3722164 | JPH04330397 | DE19951954 | US2001016160 |