EP1491655 - Stabilizers to inhibit the polymerization of substituted cyclotetrasiloxane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mayorga, Steven Gerard 3719 Via del Rancho Oceanside CA 92056 / US | 02 /
Xiao, Manchao 5534 Caballos Place San Diego CA 92130 / US | 03 /
Gaffney, Thomas Richard 7821 Sitio Tejo Carlsbad CA 92009 / US | 04 /
Syvret, Robert George 1156 Clearwood Drive Allentown PA 18103-5451 / US | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Andrae Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | Westendorp Sommer Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/12] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte P.O. Box 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/01] | Teipel, Susanne, Dr. Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04014368.7 | 18.06.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | US20030602279 | 23.06.2003 Original published format: US 602279 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1491655 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1491655 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | [2007/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1491655 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/40, H01L21/316 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
C23C16/401 (EP,US);
C08G77/38 (KR);
C01B33/113 (KR);
C07F7/20 (EP,US);
C07F7/21 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/04 (KR);
C09D4/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/13 (EP,US);
H01L21/02126 (EP);
H01L21/02164 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02216 (EP);
H01L21/02271 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08G77/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | Stabilisatoren, um die Polymerisation substituierter Cyclotetrasiloxane zu verhindern | [2010/45] | English: | Stabilizers to inhibit the polymerization of substituted cyclotetrasiloxane | [2005/01] | French: | Stabilisateurs pour empêcher la polymerisation d'un cyclotetrasiloxane substitué | [2005/01] |
Former [2005/01] | Stabilisatoren, um die Polymerisation subtituierter Cyclotetrasiloxanen zu verhindern | Examination procedure | 21.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.01.2011 | BE | 05.01.2011 | CY | 05.01.2011 | CZ | 05.01.2011 | DK | 05.01.2011 | EE | 05.01.2011 | FI | 05.01.2011 | HU | 05.01.2011 | IT | 05.01.2011 | NL | 05.01.2011 | PL | 05.01.2011 | RO | 05.01.2011 | SE | 05.01.2011 | SI | 05.01.2011 | SK | 05.01.2011 | TR | 05.01.2011 | BG | 05.04.2011 | GR | 06.04.2011 | ES | 16.04.2011 | PT | 05.05.2011 | GB | 18.06.2011 | IE | 18.06.2011 | LU | 18.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
TR | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
GB | 18.06.2011 | ||
IE | 18.06.2011 | ||
LU | 18.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
GB | 18.06.2011 | ||
IE | 18.06.2011 | ||
LU | 18.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
GB | 18.06.2011 | ||
IE | 18.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
GB | 18.06.2011 | ||
IE | 18.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | PL | 05.01.2011 | |
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | SE | 05.01.2011 | |
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | SI | 05.01.2011 | |
ES | 16.04.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5118735 (BURNIER JULIA S [US]) [Y] 1-14 * column 2, line 8 - line 35 * * column 7, line 9 - line 24; claims 1,4 *; | [Y]WO9815499 (CORNING INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, line 8 - line 25; claims 1,4,7-15 *; | [PX]EP1321469 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [PX] 1-14 * claims 1,4-7,19-21 *; | [PX]US2004039219 (CHEN TIANNIU [US], et al) [PX] 1-3,8-14* claims 1,4,12-16 *; | [PX]WO2004027110 (ARCH SPEC CHEM INC [US]) [PX] 1-14 * claims 1,2,9,11,13-15,38,47,54,56,58,59 * | by applicant | US5118735 | WO9815499 | EP1321469 | WO2004027110 |