EP1498377 - Chopper table [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Komori Corporation 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/25] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Komori Corporation 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujiwara, Kenji Komori Corporation Sekiyado Plant 210 Kirigasaku Noda-shi Chiba / JP | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04014837.1 | 24.06.2004 | [2005/03] | Priority number, date | JP20030196928 | 15.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003196928 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1498377 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1498377 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/18 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
B65H45/18 (EP,US);
Y10T83/739 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Title | German: | Falttisch einer Schwertfalzvorrichtung | [2005/03] | English: | Chopper table | [2005/03] | French: | Table d'une plieuse à lame | [2005/03] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 21.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2006 | BE | 21.06.2006 | CY | 21.06.2006 | CZ | 21.06.2006 | EE | 21.06.2006 | FI | 21.06.2006 | PL | 21.06.2006 | RO | 21.06.2006 | SI | 21.06.2006 | SK | 21.06.2006 | TR | 21.06.2006 | LU | 24.06.2006 | IE | 26.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | BG | 21.09.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | HU | 22.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
TR | 21.06.2006 | ||
LU | 24.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
HU | 22.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
HU | 22.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1129258 ; | [A]US4419088 (NEMEC DAVID G [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 27 *; | [A]EP1197459 (TOKYO KIKAI SEISAKUSHO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11029258 A 19990202 (KOMORI CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |