EP1612224 - Novel monoclonal thyroid stimulating or blocking antibodies, peptide sequences corresponding to their variable regions, and their uses in diagnostic, preventive and therapeutic medicine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B.R.A.H.M.S GmbH Neuendorfstrasse 25 16761 Hennigsdorf / DE | [2010/39] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states B.R.A.H.M.S Aktiengesellschaft Neuendorfstrasse 25 16761 Hennigsdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergmann, Andreas, Dr. Baumläuferweg 47 12351 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Morgenthaler, Nils, G. Heiligenseestrasse 121 F 13503 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Vassart, Gilbert 113 avenue Lambeau 1200 Bruxelles / BE | 04 /
Costagliola, Sabine 31 rue de Menuet 1080 Bruxelles / BE | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Andrae, Steffen, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Andrae, Steffen, et al Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015239.9 | 29.06.2004 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1612224 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612224 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
C07K16/2869 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/16 (EP);
G01N33/564 (EP,US);
G01N33/76 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/75 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Title | German: | Neue monoklonale Schilddrüsen-stimulierende oder -blockierende Antikörper, korrespondierende Peptidesquenzen ihrer variablen Regionen, und deren Verwendung in Diagnostik, präventiver und therapeutischer Medizin | [2006/01] | English: | Novel monoclonal thyroid stimulating or blocking antibodies, peptide sequences corresponding to their variable regions, and their uses in diagnostic, preventive and therapeutic medicine | [2006/01] | French: | Nouvel anticorps monoclonal stimulant ou blocquant la thyroide, les séquences peptidiques correspondant à ses régions variables, et leur utilisation dans le diagnostic ou en médecine préventive et thérapeutique. | [2006/01] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 24.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 28.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.05.2011 | 20.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2006 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2004 | CY | 07.03.2012 | CZ | 07.03.2012 | DK | 07.03.2012 | EE | 07.03.2012 | FI | 07.03.2012 | NL | 07.03.2012 | PL | 07.03.2012 | RO | 07.03.2012 | SE | 07.03.2012 | SI | 07.03.2012 | SK | 07.03.2012 | TR | 07.03.2012 | BG | 07.06.2012 | GR | 08.06.2012 | IE | 29.06.2012 | LU | 29.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | PT | 09.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 29.06.2012 | ||
LU | 29.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 29.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 29.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 29.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | NL | 07.03.2012 | |
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 07.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9523865 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 19,20* the whole document *; | [A]WO0049050 (BRAHMS DIAGNOSTICA GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0061637 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 19,20 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03018632 (RSR LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9-13,17,18 * page 64, paragraph 2 * * page 65, paragraph 3 * * page 95; example 2 * * page 95, paragraph 3 - page 96, paragraph 1 * * page 98; table 1 * * page 100; table 2 *; | [X]WO2004050708 (RSR LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,9-13,17,18 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 7 * * page 37, paragraph 4 * * page 67, paragraph 2 * * page 60, paragraph 4 * * page 68, paragraph 2 * * page 71, paragraph 2 * * page 72, paragraph 6 * * page 33, paragraph 2 * * page 49, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 52, paragraph 2 * * page 39, paragraph 2 * * claim 105 *; | [X] - SANDERS J ET AL, "THYROID-STIMULATING MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES", THYROID, MARY ANN LIEBERT, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200212), vol. 12, no. 12, ISSN 1050-7256, pages 1043 - 1050, XP009015389 [X] 1,4,9-13,17,18 * abstract * * page 1045, column L, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * * page 1046, column R, paragraph 3 * * figures 2,3 * * page 1048, column L, paragraph 2 - paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/105072502321085135 | [A] - SANDERS J ET AL, "Human monoclonal thyroid stimulating autoantibody.", LANCET (NORTH AMERICAN EDITION), (20030712), vol. 362, no. 9378, ISSN 0099-5355, pages 126 - 128, XP004438162 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(03)13866-4 | [A] - COSTAGLIOLA S ET AL, "Generation of a mouse monoclonal TSH receptor antibody with stimulating activity.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (20021220), vol. 299, no. 5, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 891 - 896, XP002303966 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(02)02762-6 | [A] - ANDO TAKAO ET AL, "A monoclonal thyroid-stimulating antibody.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (200212), vol. 110, no. 11, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 1667 - 1674, XP002303967 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI200216991 | [A] - KOSUGI SHINJI ET AL, "Identification of thyroid-stimulating antibody-specific interaction sites in the N-terminal region of the thyrotropin receptor", MOLECULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1993), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 0888-8809, pages 114 - 130, XP002303968 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/me.7.1.114 | Examination | - MORGENTHALER N G ET AL, "AFFINITY PURIFICATION AND DIAGNOSTIC USE OF TSH RECEPTOR AUTOANTIBODIES FROM HUMAN SERUM", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, ELSEVIER IRELAND LTD, IE, (20030101), vol. 212, no. 1/02, doi:10.1016/J.MCE.2003.09.018, ISSN 0303-7207, pages 73 - 79, XP001188295 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mce.2003.09.018 | - MINICH W B ET AL, "Antibodies to TSH-receptor in thyroid autoimmune disease interact with monoclonal antibodies whose epitopes are broadly distributed on the receptor.", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY APR 2004 LNKD- PUBMED:15030524, (200404), vol. 136, no. 1, ISSN 0009-9104, pages 129 - 136 | - SMITH B R ET AL, "TSH receptor antibodies", THYROID, MARY ANN LIEBERT, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20071001), vol. 17, no. 10, ISSN 1050-7256, pages 923 - 938, XP009111672 | - SANDERS JANE ET AL, "Effects of TSH receptor mutations on binding and biological activity of monoclonal antibodies and TSH", THYROID, MARY ANN LIEBERT, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20061201), vol. 16, no. 12, doi:10.1089/THY.2006.16.1195, ISSN 1050-7256, pages 1195 - 1206, XP009100831 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/thy.2006.16.1195 |