EP1494459 - Signal processing device, signal processing program and electronic camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoshuyama, Hideo Nikon Corporation Int. Property Org. 3-2, Marunouchi 3-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Volpert, Marcus, et al Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Herrnstrasse 4 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | Volpert, Marcus, et al Zeitler, Volpert, Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Herrnstrasse 44 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/01] | Volpert, Marcus, Dr. Patentanwälte, Kern, Volpert & Kollegen, Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015260.5 | 29.06.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | JP20030189520 | 01.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003189520 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1494459 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1494459 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | [2007/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1494459 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
H04N1/60 (EP,US);
H04N25/134 (EP,US);
H04N25/611 (EP,US);
H04N9/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/36] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Signalverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Signalverarbeitungsprogramm und elektronische Kamera | [2005/01] | English: | Signal processing device, signal processing program and electronic camera | [2005/01] | French: | Appareil de traitement de signaux, programme de traitement de signaux et caméra électronique | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 04.07.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0604758 (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * page 1, line 12 - line 52 * * page 6, column 15 - column 31 ** page 10, column 22 - column 47 *; | [Y]US5585860 (TAKESHIMA MASAHIRO [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, line 65 - column 5, line 64 *; | [X]US6229580 (INOUE AKIRA [JP]) [X] 1-12 * column 6, line 39 - column 13, line 53 * |