EP1495858 - LIGHTWEIGHT MATERIAL STRUCTURE MADE OF METAL COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/02] | Lightweight material structure made of metal composite material | ||
[2019/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2016/44] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vichniakov, Alexei Siedlung 19 39171 Bahrendorf / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Hans-Jürgen An der Rehwiese 26 21614 Buxtehude / DE | [2019/32] |
Former [2005/02] | 01 /
Vichniakov, Alexei, Dr.-Ing. Siedlung 19 39171 Bahrendorf / DE | ||
02 /
Schmidt, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. An der Rehwiese 26 21614 Buxtehude / DE | Representative(s) | Klöpper, Ute Airbus Operations GmbH Patentabteilung XIG Kreetslag 10 29129 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | Klöpper, Ute Airbus Deutschland GmbH Abt.: ER-Patente Postfach 95 01 09 21111 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/02] | Klöpper, Ute, Dipl.-Ing. Airbus Deutschland GmbH, Abt.: ER-Patente, Postfach 95 01 09 21111 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015293.6 | 30.06.2004 | [2005/02] | Priority number, date | DE20031030709 | 08.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10330709 | [2005/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1495858 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1495858 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/08, B32B3/14, B32B15/08, B64C1/06, B64C1/12, B64C1/00 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
B32B3/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/092 (US);
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/20 (US);
B32B27/38 (US);
B32B3/14 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (US);
B32B2260/021 (US);
B32B2260/046 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/32] |
Former [2005/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LEICHTBAUSTRUKTUR AUS METALLISCHEN SCHICHTWERKSTOFFEN | [2019/12] | English: | LIGHTWEIGHT MATERIAL STRUCTURE MADE OF METAL COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2019/12] | French: | STRUCTURE LÉGÈRE D'UN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE MÉTALLIQUE | [2019/12] |
Former [2005/02] | Leichtbaustruktur aus metallischen Schichtwerkstoffen | ||
Former [2005/02] | Lightweight material structure made of metal composite material | ||
Former [2005/02] | Structure légère d'un matériau composite métallique | Examination procedure | 12.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 26.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.08.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 19.08.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.09.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2004 | CY | 07.08.2019 | CZ | 07.08.2019 | DK | 07.08.2019 | EE | 07.08.2019 | ES | 07.08.2019 | FI | 07.08.2019 | IT | 07.08.2019 | MC | 07.08.2019 | NL | 07.08.2019 | PL | 07.08.2019 | RO | 07.08.2019 | SE | 07.08.2019 | SI | 07.08.2019 | SK | 07.08.2019 | TR | 07.08.2019 | BG | 07.11.2019 | GR | 08.11.2019 | PT | 09.12.2019 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/12] | CZ | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/23] | DK | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | DK | 07.08.2019 | |
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
ES | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
NL | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
NL | 07.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4411380 (MCWITHEY ROBERT R [US], et al) [A] 1,4-6,8-10 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US4500589 (SCHIJVE JACOBUS [NL], et al) [A] 8-13 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9215453 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT [GB]) [A] 4-10,13,15 * page 9; claims 1-4,10; table . *; | [XA]WO9853989 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [X] 1 * page 6, lines 19-31; figure 1; claims 1,4-8,11-14 * [A] 4-10; | [A]US6114050 (WESTRE WILLARD N [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 31-33; claims 1,37-39 *; | [PX]EP1393893 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-3,16-21 * claims 1-10 *; | [DPXA]DE10238460 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [DPX] 1-3,16-21 * figure 2; claims 1,5-10 *[A] 4,14 |