EP1598026 - Root canal reamers for handpieces with reaming portions more than 16 mm long [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sweden & Martina S.p.a. Via Veneto, 10 35020 Due Carrare (PD) / IT | [2005/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malagnino, Vito Antonio, Dr. Via Veneto 10 35020 Due Carrare (Padova) / IT | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Gustorf, Gerhard Bachstrasse 6a 84036 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Gustorf, Gerhard Patentanwalt, Bachstrasse 6 A 84036 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015303.3 | 30.06.2004 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | IT2004PD00128 | 19.05.2004 Original published format: IT PD20040128 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1598026 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/02 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
A61C5/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Title | German: | Zahnwurzelkanal-Aufbereitungsinstrument für Handstücke, dessen erweiternen Teil länger als 16mm ist | [2005/47] | English: | Root canal reamers for handpieces with reaming portions more than 16 mm long | [2005/47] | French: | Alésoir pour canal radiculaire pour une pièce a main la quelle partie d'alésage est plus le 16mm en longueur | [2005/47] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 08.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/39] | 21.08.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/39] | Appeal following examination | 16.05.2008 | Appeal received No. T1912/08 | 15.07.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.06.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9622060 (JOHNSON WILLIAM B [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [XY]US5941760 (HEATH DEREK E [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [XY]US6213771 (FISCHER DAN E [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [XY]US6315558 (FARZIN-NIA FARROKH [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *[Y] 2; | [X]EP1405609 (SWEDEN & MARTINA SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * |