EP1493666 - Multi-layered arrangement of foil layers for supplying power to light emitting diodes in aircraft cabin lighting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kohlmeier-Beckmann, Carsten Lüneburger Strasse 7 21614 Buxtehude / DE | 02 /
Blechschmidt, Karl-Heinz Hohenfelder Weg 12 21641 Apensen / DE | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Klöpper, Ute Airbus Operations GmbH Patentabteilung XIG Kreetslag 10 29129 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Klöpper, Ute, Dipl.-Ing. Airbus Deutschland GmbH, Abt.: ER-Patente, Postfach 95 01 09 21111 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015579.8 | 02.07.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | DE20031029751 | 02.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10329751 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1493666 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B64D47/02, B60Q3/00 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
B64D47/02 (EP,US);
B60Q3/47 (EP,US);
B60Q3/745 (EP,US);
B64D2011/0038 (EP,US);
B64D2203/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | Mehrlagige Leiterbahnenanordnung für die Stromversorgung einer Flugzeugkabinenbeleuchtung mit Leuchtdioden | [2005/01] | English: | Multi-layered arrangement of foil layers for supplying power to light emitting diodes in aircraft cabin lighting | [2005/01] | French: | Dispositif à multiples pistes conductives pour l'alimentation de l'éclairage à diodes électroluminescantes d'une cabine d'aéronef | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/36] | 18.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19853742 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6158882 (BISCHOFF JR A JOHN [US]) [Y] 5 * column 1, lines 11-19 * * column 2, lines 12-31,51-55 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 12 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 8 * * column 5, lines 49-60; figure - *; | [DY]US6203180 (FLEISCHMANN WALTER [DE]) [DY] 2 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6371637 (ATCHINSON GEOFFREY P [US], et al) [Y] 13-17 * column 1, lines 12-15 * * column 2, lines 46-50,56-63 * * column 5, lines 16-23 * * column 6, lines 21-40 * * column 8, lines 8-23 * * column 10, lines 11-15,63-66; figure - *; | [A]US2002079505 (BECKER STEFAN [DE], et al); | [XY]US2003048641 (ALEXANDERSON JAMES KENNETH [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,18 * paragraphs [0003] , [0023] , [0027] , [0035] - [0038]; figure - * [Y] 2,5,13-17 |