EP1505741 - Method and apparatus for scheduling multiple users in a mobile communication system using multiple transmit/receive antennas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | For all designated states Yonsei University 134 Sinchon-dong, Seodaemun-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
For all designated states Yonsei University 134 Sinchon-dong, Seodaemun-gu Seoul / KR | |||
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
For all designated states Yonsei University 134 Sinchon-dong, Seodaemun-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Hak-Joo Yonsei University 134, Shinchon-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Lee, Chung-Yong Yonsei University 134, Shinchon-dong Seodaemun-gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Chung, Jae-Hak Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Hwang, Chan-Soo Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015616.8 | 02.07.2004 | [2005/06] | Priority number, date | KR20030054674 | 07.08.2003 Original published format: KR 2003054674 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1505741 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1505741 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1505741 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
H04B7/0626 (EP,US);
H04B7/0452 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0417 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0456 (KR);
H04L25/0204 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/542 (EP,US);
H04L25/0248 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2008/50] |
Former [2005/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ordnung mehrerer Benutzer in einem mobilen Kommunikationssystem mit mehreren Sende- und Empfangsantennen | [2005/06] | English: | Method and apparatus for scheduling multiple users in a mobile communication system using multiple transmit/receive antennas | [2005/06] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'ordonnancement de multiples utilisateurs dans un système de communication mobile comportant plusieurs antennes d'émission/réception | [2005/06] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 07.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 17.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003043929 (SAMPATH HEMANTH [US]); | [X]WO03023995 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | by applicant | US2003043929 | WO03023995 |