EP1611815 - Method for the decoration of human body parts using patterns [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nieding, Marc Alexander Süllbergsterrasse 33 20587 Hamburg / DE | For all designated states Piephoe, Heinz Uwe Travestrasse 2 22851 Norderstedt / DE | For all designated states Warstat, Jan Triftweg 10 21217 Seevetal / DE | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015634.1 | 02.07.2004 | [2006/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1611815 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A45D40/30, A45D44/00 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
B44C1/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/36] |
Former [2006/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Dekorieren von Teilen des menschlichen Körpers mit Mustern | [2006/01] | English: | Method for the decoration of human body parts using patterns | [2006/01] | French: | Procédé de décoration des parties du corps humain avec motifs | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 08.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.08.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.08.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1815497 (OREAL) [A] 1-3,11 * page 9 - page 10; figures 1-4 * * page 7, paragraph 4 *; | [A]US4383539 (COLLINS ALAN L [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 64; figures 1A-3 *; | [A]DE3436650 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 9 * page 1 - page 3 *; | [A]DE3420867 (HOFMANN EDGAR F DR, et al) [A] 1-4,12* page 5 - page 6 *; | [A]EP0333604 (CHAUSSINAND GILLES) [A] 1-3,7,10 * column 4 - column 6; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US5816269 (MOHAMMED KHADIJA [US]) [A] 1-3,7,10 * column 2 - column 4; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2002011014 (LIPPER CHRIS [US]) [A] 8 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0036]; figures 3-6 * |