EP1598743 - Data communication cable for connection between mobile communication terminal and computer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kang, Gil-Jong Hyojachon Samhwan Apt. 505-101, Seohyeon-2 dong, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do, 463-765 / KR | [2005/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/47] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015672.1 | 02.07.2004 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | KR20040013699 | 18.05.2004 Original published format: KR 2004013699 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1598743 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1598743 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
G06F13/40 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/70 (KR);
H01R24/60 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/20] |
Former [2005/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Datenübertragungskabel für die Verbindung zwischen mobilem Kommunikationsendgerät und Rechner | [2005/47] | English: | Data communication cable for connection between mobile communication terminal and computer | [2005/47] | French: | Câble de communication de données pour la connexion entre un terminal mobile de communication et un ordinateur | [2005/47] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/33] | 09.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0217598 (ITECHSOLUTION CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 2-6 * * page 4, line 31 - line 38 * * page 5, line 10 - line 17 * * page 6, line 20 - line 29 * * page 7, line 3 - line 6 *; | [A]US2003032333 (KWONG BILL [US]) [A] 2,3,5 * figure 2 ** page 1, column R, line 28 - line 36 *; | [A]US2003119553 (CHUANG HUI CHANG [TW]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |