EP1500888 - Charge distributing device in at least two parts above a bunker installed at the shaft furnace top [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Z & J Technologies GmbH Bahnstrasse 52 52355 Düren / DE | [2005/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Irnich, Franz-Josef Antoniusstrasse 4 52393 Hürtgenwalt / DE | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015769.5 | 05.07.2004 | [2005/04] | Priority number, date | DE2003133569 | 23.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10333569 | [2005/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1500888 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1500888 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F27B1/20, C21B7/18 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
F27B1/20 (EP,US);
C21B7/18 (EP,US);
C21B7/20 (EP,US);
F27D3/10 (EP,US);
F27D2003/105 (EP,US);
F27D2003/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/04] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Verteilung von Schüttgut in wenigstens zwei oberhalb der Gicht eines Hochofens angeordnete Bunker | [2005/04] | English: | Charge distributing device in at least two parts above a bunker installed at the shaft furnace top | [2005/04] | French: | Dispositif pour la distribition en au moins deux parties de la charge au dessus de la tremie disposee sur le gueulart du haut fourneaU | [2005/04] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 09.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.07.2008 | DK | 16.07.2008 | EE | 16.07.2008 | IE | 16.07.2008 | SI | 16.07.2008 | BG | 16.10.2008 | GR | 17.10.2008 | PT | 16.12.2008 | [2011/44] |
Former [2010/49] | DK | 16.07.2008 | |
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 16.07.2008 | |
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 16.07.2008 | |
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 16.07.2008 | |
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | SI | 16.07.2008 | |
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | BG | 16.10.2008 | |
PT | 16.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE306976 (A DAIBER) [A] 1 * page 1; figure . *; | [X]US3598258 (GREWER RUDOLF) [X] 1 * figures 3,4; claim - *; | [X]US3693812 (MAHR RENE N, et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 31; figure 1; claim - *; | [A]US3799368 (WIECZOREK J) [A] * figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB1420407 (WURTH ANCIENS ETS PAUL) [A] * figure -; claim - * |