EP1502781 - Vehicle having an air conditioning unit and use of an air conditioning unit thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toda, Isao c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1,Shinchi,Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730 8670 / JP | 02 /
Iwasaka, Kouji c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1,Shinchi,Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730 8670 / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Yukio c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1,Shinchi,Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730 8670 / JP | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04015883.4 | 06.07.2004 | [2005/05] | Priority number, date | JP20030192915 | 07.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003192915 | JP20030271902 | 08.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003271902 | JP20030275783 | 17.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003275783 | JP20030279079 | 24.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003279079 | JP20030279078 | 24.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003279078 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1502781 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1502781 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
B60H1/244 (EP);
B60H1/00007 (EP);
B60H1/00207 (EP);
B60H1/00285 (EP);
B60H1/00407 (EP);
B60H1/247 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2006/12] |
Former [2005/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Klimaanlage und ihre Verwendung bei einem Kraftfahrzeug | [2005/05] | English: | Vehicle having an air conditioning unit and use of an air conditioning unit thereof | [2005/05] | French: | Dispositif de climatisation et leur utilisation d'un véhicule | [2005/05] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 06.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 01.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0039468 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,19 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5511842 (DILLON JOHN A [US]) [Y] 9,10 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE19654370 (SCHATZINGER LUDWIG [DE]) [Y] 7,8 * figures 3,4 *; | [Y]EP0870633 (TRESS FRANZ [DE]) [Y] 14,15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5839293 (TEITELBAUM NEIL [CA], et al) [Y] 14,15 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 5 ** figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19756311 (KOCH STEPHAN [DE]) [Y] 14,15 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 48 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]US6332330 (LOUP DIDIER [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,19 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 11 * * figure 1 * [Y] 7-10; | [A]EP1203690 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 7,8 * the whole document * |