EP1510381 - Electrical heating element for ventilating, heating and/or air conditioning unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | ||
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | ||
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | ||
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states VALEO CLIMATISATION 8, rue Louis Lormand 78321 La Verrière / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terranova, Gilbert 19, rue de Parfond 78610 Le Perray en Yvelines / FR | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Rolland, Jean-Christophe Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [2013/15] |
Former [2013/14] | Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04016070.7 | 08.07.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | FR20030010327 | 29.08.2003 Original published format: FR 0310327 | [2005/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510381 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1510381 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/04] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1510381 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/22, F24H9/20, H05B1/02 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
H05B1/028 (EP);
B60H1/2225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Heizelement für Lüftungs-, Heizungs- und/oder Klimaanlagen | [2005/09] | English: | Electrical heating element for ventilating, heating and/or air conditioning unit | [2005/09] | French: | Elément de chauffage électrique pour appareil de ventilation, de chauffage et/ou de climatisation d'habitacle | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 20.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.10.2007
23.10.2007
ADMISSIBLE BorgWarner BERU Systems GmbH Mörikestr. 155 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE Opponent's representative Mommer, Niels Twelmeier Mommer & Partner Westliche 56-68 75172 Pforzheim / DE | 02
23.10.2007
05.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Grauel, Andreas Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Wartbergstrasse 14 70191 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.10.2007
23.10.2007
ADMISSIBLE BorgWarner BERU Systems GmbH Mörikestr. 155 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE Opponent's representative Mommer, Niels Twelmeier Mommer & Partner Westliche 56-68 75172 Pforzheim / DE | ||
02
23.10.2007
05.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Grauel, Andreas Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Presselstrasse 10 70191 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2010/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.10.2007
23.10.2007
ADMISSIBLE BorgWarner BERU Systems GmbH Mörikestr. 155 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE Opponent's representative Mommer, Niels Twelmeier Mommer & Partner Westliche 56-68 75172 Pforzheim / DE | ||
02
23.10.2007
05.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Wallinger, Michael Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2009/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.10.2007
23.10.2007
ADMISSIBLE BERU AG Mörikestr. 155 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE Opponent's representative Mommer, Niels Twelmeier Mommer & Partner Westliche 56-68 75172 Pforzheim / DE | ||
02
23.10.2007
05.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Wallinger, Michael Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.10.2007
23.10.2007
ADMISSIBLE BERU AG Mörikestr. 155 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | ||
02
23.10.2007
05.11.2007
ADMISSIBLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Wallinger, Michael Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2007/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.10.2007
23.10.2007
ADMISSIBLE BERU AG Mörikestr. 155 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | ||
02
23.10.2007
Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Wallinger, Michael Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 D-80331 München / DE | |||
Former [2007/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.10.2007
23.10.2007
ADMISSIBLE BERU AG Mörikestr. 155 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | 12.02.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.08.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.02.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.03.2013 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.05.2013 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.10.2013 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 24.05.2010 | Appeal received No. T0996/10 | 02.08.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.03.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 05.05.2010 | Appeal received No. T0996/10 | 02.08.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.03.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 01.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.03.2013 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2007 | CY | 24.01.2007 | DK | 24.01.2007 | EE | 24.01.2007 | FI | 24.01.2007 | GB | 24.01.2007 | IE | 24.01.2007 | NL | 24.01.2007 | PL | 24.01.2007 | RO | 24.01.2007 | SI | 24.01.2007 | SK | 24.01.2007 | TR | 24.01.2007 | SE | 24.04.2007 | BG | 25.04.2007 | GR | 25.04.2007 | PT | 25.06.2007 | LU | 08.07.2007 | HU | 25.07.2007 | BE | 31.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | CH | 31.07.2008 | LI | 31.07.2008 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
CY | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
EE | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
GB | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
RO | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
LU | 08.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
CY | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
EE | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
GB | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
RO | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
EE | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
GB | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
RO | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
EE | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
GB | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
RO | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
GB | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
RO | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
GB | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
RO | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
GB | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
RO | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
GB | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SK | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
IE | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 24.01.2007 | |
NL | 24.01.2007 | ||
PL | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0901311 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19925757 (BEHR FRANCE SARL [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1157869 (CATEM GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2827113 (VALEO CLIMATISATION [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2826912 (VALEO CLIMATISATION [FR]) [A] 1* abstract * | Opposition | EP0840534 | EP1338451 |