EP1615086 - Method and device to display a cycle of images of the moon, notably in a watch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/02] | Procedure and device to display a cycle of images of the moon, notably in a watch | ||
[2011/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASULAB S.A. Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Born, Jean-Jacques Rue Louis de Savoie 59 1110 Morges / CH | 02 /
Meylan, Frédéric Beauregard 16 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2010/12] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2009/35] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Fbg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2009/12] | Rossand, Isabelle, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | ||
Former [2006/02] | Laurent, Jean, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 04016085.5 | 08.07.2004 | [2006/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1615086 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1615086 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G04B19/26 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
G04B19/268 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Title | German: | Verfahrung und Gerät zur Anzeige der Folge von Bildern des Monds, insbesondere in einer Uhr | [2006/02] | English: | Method and device to display a cycle of images of the moon, notably in a watch | [2011/21] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour afficher un cycle d'images de la lune, notamment dans une montre | [2006/02] |
Former [2006/02] | Procedure and device to display a cycle of images of the moon, notably in a watch | Examination procedure | 11.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 04.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2004 | AT | 07.12.2011 | CY | 07.12.2011 | CZ | 07.12.2011 | DK | 07.12.2011 | EE | 07.12.2011 | FI | 07.12.2011 | IE | 07.12.2011 | IT | 07.12.2011 | NL | 07.12.2011 | PL | 07.12.2011 | RO | 07.12.2011 | SE | 07.12.2011 | SI | 07.12.2011 | SK | 07.12.2011 | TR | 07.12.2011 | BG | 07.03.2012 | GR | 08.03.2012 | ES | 18.03.2012 | PT | 09.04.2012 | LU | 08.07.2012 | BE | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
LU | 08.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 07.12.2011 | |
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH688171 (PATEK PHILIPPE S.A) [A] 1-14 * figure 8 * * page 4, line 54 - page 5, line 33 *; | [A]JPS6060580 ; | [DA]US508467 (E A CLARK) [DA] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [DA]CH598638 (BAUMGARTNER FRERES SA) [DA] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2833721 (DZIULKO ADOLPHE RICHARD [FR]) [A] 1-14* figure 3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850813), vol. 009, no. 195, Database accession no. (P - 379), & JP60060580 A 19850408 (CITIZEN TOKEI KK) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1-9 * |