EP1500535 - Device and method for vehicle air conditioning during vehicle stop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baruschke, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. Rechbergweg 5 73117 Wangen / DE | 02 /
Britsch-Laudwein, Armin Schönblickstrasse 97 71272 Renningen / DE | 03 /
Bureau, Cathy, Dipl.-Ing. 1691 Shipman Blvd. 48009 Birmingham MI / US | 04 /
Lochmahr, Karl, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Mohnweg 5 71665 Vaihingen / DE | 05 /
Morgenstern, Stefan, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Hohenfriedberger Strasse 50 70499 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/04] | Application number, filing date | 04016155.6 | 09.07.2004 | [2005/04] | Priority number, date | DE2003133734 | 23.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10333734 | [2005/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1500535 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1500535 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/32 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
B60H1/322 (EP,US);
B60H1/3222 (EP,US);
B60H1/323 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [2005/41] |
Former [2005/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Standklimatisierung eines Fahrzeugs | [2005/04] | English: | Device and method for vehicle air conditioning during vehicle stop | [2005/04] | French: | Appareil et procédé de climatisation d'un véhicule à l'arrêt | [2005/04] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 24.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4878359 (MANDELL GERALD D [US]) [Y] 9,10 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 14; figures 6,7 *; | [XY]DE4414547 (KONVEKTA AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-8,11 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 30; figure 1 * [Y] 9-11; | [Y]DE19800004 (LINDE AG [DE]) [Y] 10* column 1, line 16 - column 2, line 40; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19927518 (VALEO KLIMASYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [Y] 9 * column 4, line 8 - line 26; figure 1 *; | [XY]DE10036793 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-8,11,12,14-19,21 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0027]; figure 1 * [Y] 9-11; | [XY]DE10218081 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-8,12-21 * paragraphs [0036] - [0061]; figures 1,5,8,9,12,13 * [Y] 9-11 |