EP1615390 - Mapping of network configuration data to network interfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schiebli, Daniel Auguststrasse 20 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/02] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 04016208.3 | 09.07.2004 | [2006/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1615390 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1615390 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
H04L12/46 (EP,US);
H04L61/5014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Title | German: | Konvertierung von Netzwerkkonfigurationsdaten zu Netzwerkschnittstellen | [2006/02] | English: | Mapping of network configuration data to network interfaces | [2006/02] | French: | Conversion des informations de configuration de réseau aux interfaces de réseau | [2006/02] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 08.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.11.2007 | 24.10.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.2008 | BE | 29.10.2008 | CY | 29.10.2008 | CZ | 29.10.2008 | DK | 29.10.2008 | EE | 29.10.2008 | FI | 29.10.2008 | IT | 29.10.2008 | NL | 29.10.2008 | PL | 29.10.2008 | RO | 29.10.2008 | SI | 29.10.2008 | SK | 29.10.2008 | TR | 29.10.2008 | BG | 29.01.2009 | SE | 29.01.2009 | GR | 30.01.2009 | ES | 09.02.2009 | PT | 30.03.2009 | HU | 30.04.2009 | IE | 09.07.2009 | LU | 09.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
HU | 30.04.2009 | ||
IE | 09.07.2009 | ||
LU | 09.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
IE | 09.07.2009 | ||
LU | 09.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
IE | 09.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
IE | 09.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 09.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6061334 (BERLOVITCH ALBERT [IL], et al) [X] 1-14 * figures 1-12 * * column 1, lines 35-67 * * column 2, lines 3-8,25-35 * * column 4, lines 1-16,45-55 * * column 7, lines 49-64 * * column 8, lines 54-67 * * column 9, lines 1-54 * * column 11, lines 23-26 * * column 13, lines 23-49 * * column 18, lines 53-67 * * column 19, lines 1-55 * * column 22, lines 33-50 * * column 29, lines 14-36 *; | [A]US2002144156 (COPELAND JOHN A [US]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-9 * * page 1, paragraph 4 * * page 2, paragraphs 17-22 * * page 3, paragraphs 33-35 * * page 4, paragraphs 52-55 * * page 5, paragraphs 59-61 ** page 9, paragraphs 120-123 *; | [A]US2004128201 (OFIR JACOB [CA], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-6 * * page 2, paragraphs 11,14 * * page 4, paragraph 39 * * page 6, paragraph 62 * * page 7, paragraphs 73,74 * * page 8, paragraph 74 * * page 9, paragraphs 92,93 * * page 10, paragraphs 104,108 * * page 11, paragraph 119 * |