EP1499048 - OTU frame generating apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANRITSU CORPORATION 1800, Onna Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2007/22] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Anritsu Corporation 1800, Onna Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imazeki, Hajime 2-10-37-107, Isehara Isehara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kibe, Koichi B202, 419, Toda Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2005/03] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 04016331.3 | 12.07.2004 | [2005/03] | Priority number, date | JP20030196260 | 14.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003196260 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1499048 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1499048 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1499048 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/04 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
H04J3/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/05] |
Former [2005/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Erzeugung von OTU-Rahmen | [2005/03] | English: | OTU frame generating apparatus and method | [2005/03] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de génération de trames OTU | [2005/03] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 18.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001201374 ; | [A] - KAPLAN F, "UEBERBLICK UEBER DIE ITU-T-EMPFEHLUNG G-709", NTZ (NACHRICHTENTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT), VDE VERLAG GMBH., BERLIN, DE, (2002), vol. 55, no. 9, ISSN 0948-728X, pages 24 - 27, XP001125136 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010511), vol. 2000, no. 24, & JP2001201374 A 20010727 (ANRITSU CORP) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | [A] - PAPADIMITRIOU ALCATEL J LANG CALIENT D, "G.709 Encoding for Link Management Protocol (LMP) Test messages draft-papadimitriou-ccamp-lmp-test-g709-00.txt; draft-papadimitriou-ccamp-lmp-test-g709-00.txt", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (200210), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015004765 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | [A] - "Interface for the optical transport network (OTN)", ITU-T RECOMMENDATION G.709, (200102), pages 1 - 80, XP002195641 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |